Dean Paul Mitzel TTEE DGI Holdings 401K v. Kirkland Lake Gold Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: DEAN PAUL MITZEL TTEE DGI HOLDINGS 401K
Defendant: ANTHONY P. MAKUCH and KIRKLAND LAKE GOLD LTD.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05505
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES, WAIVING SERVICE OF PROCESS AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants, and subject to Court approval, that: The above-captioned related actions are consolidated for all purposes under the docket number of the lead case, 1:20-cv-04953-JPO. Filings in the consolidated action shall bear the caption In re Kirkland Lake Gold Ltd. Securities Litigation. Undersigned counsel for Defendants are authorized to accept, and hereby do accept, service of the Initial Complaints in these matters on behalf of Defendants, without prejudice and without waiver of any of Defendants' defenses, objections, or arguments, except as to sufficiency of service of process. Defendants are not required to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Initial Complaints unless one is designated as the operative complaint by the Court appointed lead plaintiff under the schedule below. The Court-appointed lead plaintiff shall have sixty (60) days after appointment to file an amended or consolidated complaint, or to designate one of the Initial Complaints as the operative complaint. Defendants shall answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the operative complaint within sixty (60) days after the Court-appointed lead plaintiff files an amended or consolidated complaint, or designates one of the Initial Complaints as the operative complaint. The Court-appointed lead plaintiff shall have forty-five (45) days to oppose any motions Defendants may file to dismiss the operative complaint. Defendants' replies shall be due thirty (30) days after the filing of the Court-appointed lead plaintiff's opposition papers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/28/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-04953-JPO, 1:20-cv-05505-JPO (ama)
August 28, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-04953-JPO.. (ama)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Kirkland Lake Gold Ltd., Anthony P. Makuch..(Rosen, Richard)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Richard A. Rosen dated August 27, 2020 re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order. Document filed by Kirkland Lake Gold Ltd., Anthony P. Makuch..(Rosen, Richard)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kirkland Lake Gold Ltd., Anthony P. Makuch..(Rosen, Richard)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin David Ward on behalf of Kirkland Lake Gold Ltd., Anthony P. Makuch..(Ward, Justin)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Rosen on behalf of Kirkland Lake Gold Ltd., Anthony P. Makuch..(Rosen, Richard)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 21, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-04953-JPO. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Dean Paul Mitzel TTEE DGI Holdings 401K..(Hood, Joseph)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kirkland Lake Gold Ltd., Anthony P. Makuch..(jgo)
July 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge J. Paul Oetken as possibly related to 20-cv-4953. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DEAN PAUL MITZEL TTEE DGI HOLDINGS 401K; KIRKLAND LAKE GOLD LTD.; ANTHONY P. MAKUCH. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KIRKLAND LAKE GOLD LTD. and ANTHONY P. MAKUCH, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DEAN PAUL MITZEL TTEE DGI HOLDINGS 401K..(Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-04953. Document filed by DEAN PAUL MITZEL TTEE DGI HOLDINGS 401K..(Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIRKLAND LAKE GOLD LTD., ANTHONY P. MAKUCH. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20734087)Document filed by DEAN PAUL MITZEL TTEE DGI HOLDINGS 401K..(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean Paul Mitzel TTEE DGI Holdings 401K v. Kirkland Lake Gold Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAN PAUL MITZEL TTEE DGI HOLDINGS 401K
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY P. MAKUCH
Represented By: Justin David Ward
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRKLAND LAKE GOLD LTD.
Represented By: Justin David Ward
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?