Ahmad v. Enterprise Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Iqbal Ahmad
Defendant: Ean Holdings, LLC, Nissan North America, Inc. and Enterprise Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05514
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Igbal Ahmad.Document filed by Ean Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Holdings, LLC..(Khrinenko, Peter)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Ean Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Holdings, LLC..(Khrinenko, Peter)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alyssa Jordan Pantzer on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc...(Pantzer, Alyssa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Nissan North America, Inc...(Ramsey, Homer)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Company, LTD for Nissan North America, Inc.. Document filed by Nissan North America, Inc...(Ramsey, Homer)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khrinenko, Peter)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter M. Khrinenko. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 245 (Tort Product Liability); Jury Demand code d (Defendant); Dollar Demand $75,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability); the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Peter M. Khrinenko to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple Citizenship Defendant codes selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khrinenko, Peter) Modified on 7/20/2020 (jgo).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 153823/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20735224).Document filed by Ean Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SC and Answer, #2 Exhibit Police Report, #3 Exhibit email consent).(Khrinenko, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmad v. Enterprise Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iqbal Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ean Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Khrinenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Jordan Pantzer
Represented By: Homer Baharvar Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Khrinenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?