Holmes et al v. TerraForm Power, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carl Holmes
Defendant: Brian Lawson, Harry Goldgut, Carolyn Burke, Christian S. Fong, Richard Legault, Sachin Shah, Mark McFarland and TerraForm Power, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05522
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Osborn Solum on behalf of TerraForm Power, Inc...(Solum, Matthew)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Paul Del Monaco on behalf of TerraForm Power, Inc...(Del Monaco, John)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/22/2020) (jca)
July 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 21, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05326-PGG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 20cv5326. (pc)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christian S. Fong. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-5326. Document filed by Carl Holmes..(Acocelli, Richard)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Acocelli, Richard)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn Burke, Christian S. Fong, Harry Goldgut, Brian Lawson, Richard Legault, Mark McFarland, Sachin Shah, TerraForm Power, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20736094)Document filed by Carl Holmes..(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes et al v. TerraForm Power, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Goldgut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian S. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Legault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sachin Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TerraForm Power, Inc.
Represented By: John Paul Del Monaco
Represented By: Matthew Osborn Solum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Holmes
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?