Wilson v. City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Floyd Wilson
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1 through 10, Ayotunde Adeniyi, City Of New York and Sandra Martinez
Case Number: 1:2020cv05550
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sandra Martinez served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Document filed by Floyd Wilson..(Klein, Brett)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ayotunde Adeniyi served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Document filed by Floyd Wilson..(Klein, Brett)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by LaDonna Sharde Sandford on behalf of City Of New York..(Sandford, LaDonna)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City Of New York served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Document filed by Floyd Wilson..(Klein, Brett)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York..(pne)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ayotunde Adeniyi..(pne)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandra Martinez..(pne)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brett Harris Klein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John and Jane Doe 1 through 10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information..(rpr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sandra Martinez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Floyd Wilson..(Klein, Brett)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ayotunde Adeniyi, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Floyd Wilson..(Klein, Brett)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Floyd Wilson..(Klein, Brett)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Klein, Brett)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ayotunde Adeniyi, City Of New York, John and Jane Doe 1 through 10, Sandra Martinez. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20741970)Document filed by Floyd Wilson..(Klein, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Wilson
Represented By: Brett Harris Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayotunde Adeniyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: LaDonna Sharde Sandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?