Norman v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Shomari E. Norman
Defendant: AG Josh Stein, City of New York, IG Letizia Tagliafierro, Leith Chrysler Jeep, AG Letitia James and NYCPD Commissioner Dermot Shea
Case Number: 1:2020cv05560
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 05:2302
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (12(b)(1)) and Failure to State a Claim (12(b)(6). Document filed by Josh Stein. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss).(Steed, Terence)
September 8, 2020 Mailed a copy of #31 Order, #15 MOTION to Dismiss, and #30 Letter to Shomari E. Norman at 979 Summit Ave., Apt. 2E, Bronx, NY 10452. (kh)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss within thirty days of this Order. Plaintiff is warned that failure to oppose Defendants' motion could result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a reply within fourteen days of the filing of Plaintiff's opposition. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order and Documents 15 and 30 to the pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/4/2020) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 3, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Toni E. Logue dated September 3, 2020 re: Response to the Court's September 1, 2020 Order. Document filed by Letitia James, Letizia Tagliafierro..(Logue, Toni)
September 2, 2020 Mailed a copy of #29 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause to Shomari E. Norman at 979 Summit Ave., Apt. 2E, Bronx, NY 10452. (kh)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: denying without prejudice to renewal #23 Motion for Order to Show Cause. ORDERED that Defendants shall file a letter within seven (7) days deciding whether their motion to dismiss should be deemed moot without prejudice to refile a new motion to dismiss in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3), or if I should evaluate Defendants' current motion to dismiss in light of the facts alleged in the amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's recently filed letters, (Docs. 23, 25, 26, 28), to the extent they can be construed as discovery requests, are DENIED without prejudice to refile during the discovery phase of this case, which will not begin until after a decision on Defendants' motion to dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/01/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 31, 2020 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from S. Norman, dated 8/31/20 re: The plaintiff has remanded his formal complaint and is awaiting Proof of Service. The Amended Complaint will be served before 9/17/20 time granted by Judge Broderick. At this convenient time, Plaintiff requests a digital copy of the traffic light surveillance camera on Richardson Avenue in the Bronx and the surveillance camera footage at the 47 Police Precinct. A Federal Investigator affidavit will narrow the scope of any doubt about what happened to the 2015 Jeep Patriot etc. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman.(sc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT(Addendum), re: amending #2 Complaint against City of New York, Letitia James, Leith Chrysler Jeep, Dermot Shea, Josh Stein, Letizia Tagliafierro.Document filed by Shomari E. Norman. Related document: #2 Complaint.(sc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 26 PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT(Affirmation)FOR EVIDENCE FOR CIVIL ACTION 20CV5560. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman. (sc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 25 PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT(Affirmation) of Shomari Norman FOR EVIDENCE FOR CIVIL ACTION 20CV5560. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman. (sc) (Main Document 25 replaced on 8/20/2020) (sc).
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman.(sc)
August 19, 2020 Mailed a copy of #17 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings to Shomari E. Norman at 979 Summit Ave., Apt. 2E, Bronx, NY 10452. (kh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Letizia Tagliafierro served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman. (sc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City of New York served on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Clerk, New York City Law Dept. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman. (sc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Josh Stein served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Service was accepted by Mrs. Lynn, Records Cust.. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman.(sc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint; served. Dermot Shea served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. Service was accepted by Detective Hawk D. Shea. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman. (sc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Leith Chrysler Jeep served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. Service was accepted by Angela Zach, Records Custodian. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman. (sc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 SHERIFFS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Letitia James served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. Service was accepted by Jasmine Hughes. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman. (sc)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by September 7, 2020. It is unlikely that Plaintiff will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses not to file an amended complaint and instead seeks to oppose Defendants' motion, Plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by September 16, 2020. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served by fourteen days after the opposition is filed. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/18/2020) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 18, 2020 Mailed a copy of #16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to Shomari E. Norman at 979 Summit Ave., Apt. 2E, Bronx, NY 10452. (kh)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this endorsement to the pro se plaintiff. Josh Stein answer due 9/17/2020. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/17/2020) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Letitia James, Letizia Tagliafierro. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss).(Logue, Toni)
August 17, 2020 Mailed a copy of #13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to Shomari E. Norman at 979 Summit Ave., Apt. 2E, Bronx, NY 10452. (kh)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint or Otherwise Respond addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Terence Steed dated August 14, 2020. Document filed by Josh Stein..(Steed, Terence)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted in part. Defendant shall have a 45-day extension to respond to the complaint. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/14/2020) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Alessandra DeCarlo dated 8/13/2020. Document filed by City of New York..(DeCarlo, Alessandra)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION FOR RELIEF ADDENDUM I. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman.(sc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO SUBMIT EVIDENCE. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman.(sc)
July 17, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Letizia Tagliafierro..(rdz)
July 17, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leith Chrysler Jeep..(rdz)
July 17, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (rdz)
July 17, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Letitia James..(rdz) Modified on 8/4/2020 (rdz).
July 17, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Josh Stein..(rdz)
July 17, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rdz) Modified on 8/4/2020 (rdz).
July 17, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rdz) Modified on 8/4/2020 (rdz).
July 17, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rdz) Modified on 8/4/2020 (rdz).
July 17, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rdz) Modified on 8/4/2020 (rdz).
July 17, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rdz) Modified on 8/4/2020 (rdz).
July 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Show Cause. Document filed by Shomari E. Norman.(rdz) Modified on 7/22/2020 (rdz).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Letitia James, Leith Chrysler Jeep, Dermot Shea, Josh Stein, Letizia Tagliafierro. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401262978)Document filed by Shomari E. Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rdz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz) Modified on 7/22/2020 (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Josh Stein
Represented By: Terence Patrick Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Alessandra DeCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IG Letizia Tagliafierro
Represented By: Toni Elisabeth Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leith Chrysler Jeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Letitia James
Represented By: Toni Elisabeth Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYCPD Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shomari E. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?