Blanding v. Warden John/Jane Doe
Petitioner: Johnny Blanding
Respondent: Warden John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv05588
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Mailed a copy of #4 Order of Dismissal, #5 Judgment, and Notice of Appeal Instructions to Johnny Blanding, DIN # 13-A-3005, B&C # 3491907402 at Vernon C. Bain Center, One Halleck St., Bronx, NY 10474. (kh)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the petition is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. Because the petition at this time makes no substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue under 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Petitioner and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/24/2020) (Attachments: #1 Appeal Package) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: By order dated July 21, 2020, the Court directed Petitioner, within thirty days, to submit a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP application) or pay the $5.00 in fees required to file a petition for a writ of habeas corpus in this Court.1 That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the petition. Petitioner has not filed an IFP application or paid the fee. Accordingly, the petition is dismissed without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/24/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 22, 2020 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application), to Johnny Blanding at 13-A-3005, B&C No. 3491907402, Vernon C Bain Center, One Halleck St., Bronx, NY 10474. (dsh)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from J. Blanding, re: The problem in this matter is that I appealed this case in 2016 and no answer, so I appealed in a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28:2254 and backed it up with a 440.10 Motion etc. Document filed by Johnny Blanding.(sc)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Petitioner is directed to render payment of the $5.00 filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 8/20/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 8/20/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/21/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Document filed by Johnny Blanding.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanding v. Warden John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnny Blanding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?