Gibbs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ryan D. Gibbs
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv05595
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan D. Baird on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Baird, Susan)
August 14, 2020 Remailed a copy of #4 Order of Service - Social Security, #6 Information Package to Ryan D. Gibbs at 984 Woodycrest Ave., Apt. 208, Bronx, NY 10452. (bwa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Received returned mail re: #4 Order of Service - Social Security, #6 Information Package. Mail was addressed to Ryan D. Gibbs at 984, Apt. 208 Bronx, NY 10452 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward. (bwa)
July 24, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order Granting IFP Application, to Ryan D. Gibbs at 984 Woodycrest Ave., Apt. 208, Bronx, NY 10452. (dsh)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Ryan D. Gibbs, at 984 Woodycrest Ave. Apt. 208 Bronx, NY 10452, on 7/24/2020 Re: #4 Order of Service - Social Security, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), in social security cases only, a flyer about pro bono attorneys available through the New York County Lawyers' Association. (bwa)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to mail this Order to pro se Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/23/2020) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall notify the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York of the filing of this pro se case, brought under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), for which the filing fee has been waived. In accordance with the Standing Order "Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases," 16-MC-0171 (Apr. 20, 2016): Within 90 days of the date of this order, the Commissioner must serve and file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record (e-CAR), which will constitute the Commissioner's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint. If the Commissioner wishes to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, the Commissioner must do so within 60 days of the date on which the e-CAR was filed. The motion must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and a full description of the underlying administrative proceeding. The plaintiff must file an answering brief within 60 days of the filing of the Commissioner's motion. The Commissioner may file a reply within 21 days thereafter. Memoranda in support of or in opposition to any dispositive motion may not exceed 25 pages in length; reply memoranda may not exceed ten pages in length. A party seeking to exceed these page limitations must apply to the Court for leave to do so, with copies to all counsel, no fewer than seven days before the date on which the memorandum is due. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to mail this Order to pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 10/21/2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/23/2020) (ama) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/16) (rdz)
July 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)
July 16, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Ryan D. Gibbs.(rdz)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ryan D. Gibbs..(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan D. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Susan D. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?