Andich v. Blain Southern LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lidia Andich
Defendant: Harry Blain and Blain Southern LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05728
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Blain Southern LLC served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Lidia Andich..(Xiang, Ruofei)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 10:20 a.m., on October 15, 2020, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674,and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Initial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/10/2020) (kv)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/10/2020) (ama)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/10/2020) (rro)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harry Blain..(dnh)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blain Southern LLC..(dnh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harry Blain, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lidia Andich..(Xiang, Ruofei)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Blain Southern LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lidia Andich..(Xiang, Ruofei)
July 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Xiang, Ruofei)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ruofei Xiang on behalf of Lidia Andich..(Xiang, Ruofei)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harry Blain, Blain Southern LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20817992)Document filed by Lidia Andich..(Lindstrom, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andich v. Blain Southern LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Andich
Represented By: Wendy J. Lindstrom
Represented By: Ruofei Xiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blain Southern LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?