State of New York et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: City of Seattle, State of North Carolina, State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, City of Providence, County of Hidalgo, State of Vermont, City of Columbus, State of Washington, State of Nevada, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia, City and County of San Francisco, State of Colorado, State of Illinois, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, City of Philadelphia, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, City of Chicago, City of Central Falls, District of Columbia, County of Cameron, City of New York, State of Michigan, City of Pittsburgh, County of Monterey, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, County of El Paso, State of New York, State of Hawaii, State of New Jersey, City of Phoenix, Howard County, State of Maine, State of Wisconsin and United States Conference of Mayors
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Steven Dillingham, Bureau of the Census and Donald J. Trump
Consolidated Plaintiff: Make the Road New York, Casa, FIEL Houston Inc, ADC Research Institute, New York Immigration Coalition, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee and CASA
Amicus Curiae: The League of Women Voters of the United States, 16 Businesses and Business Organizations, The League of Women Voters of California, U.S. House of Representatives, Libby Garland, Andrew Beveridge, Attorney General Richard Blumenthal, Mazie K. Hirono, Sherrod Brown, Brian Schatz, Elizabeth Warren, Natalie Molina, Ron L. Wyden, Jeffrey A. Merkley, The League of Women Voters of Florida, Margo Anderson, Steven Ruggles, Martin Heinrich, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, The League of Women Voters of Texas, Rachel Buff and Immigration Reform Law Institute
Case Number: 1:2020cv05770
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Appeal Record Sent to Supreme Court of the United States (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (174 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 67 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Notice of Appeal to the Supreme Court, filed by Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., United States Department of Commerce, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Bureau of the Census, Donald J. Trump, Steven Dillingham were transmitted to the Supreme Court of the United States. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF. (tp)
September 18, 2020 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to Supreme Court of the United States re: (174 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 67 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Notice of Appeal to the Supreme Court of the United States. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF. (tp)
September 18, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE SUPREME COURT from (164 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,,,,,, (165 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 55 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Judgment,,,,,,,. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Mauler, Daniel)
September 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Mauler, Daniel to RE-FILE Document No. (62 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF, 169 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Corrected Notice of Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the appeal. Re-file the appeal using the event type Notice of Appeal to the Supreme Court found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF(tp)
September 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Mauler, Daniel. Document No. (62 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF, 169 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Corrected Notice of Appeal,,.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the appeal. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF(nd)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER with respect to #171 Letter Motion to Stay: Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to Defendants' motion for a stay by noon on Wednesday, September 23, 2020. No reply may be filed without prior of leave of Court. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
September 16, 2020 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (64 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF, 171 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) MOTION to Stay re: (165 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 55 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Judgment,,,,,,, (Motion for Stay of Judgment Pending Appeal). . Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Mauler, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 171 MOTION to Stay re: (165 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 55 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Judgment,,,,,,, (Motion for Stay of Judgment Pending Appeal). Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Mauler, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (63 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF, 170 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., United States Department of Commerce, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Bureau of the Census, Donald J. Trump, Steven Dillingham were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF. (tp)
September 16, 2020 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (62 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF, 169 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., United States Department of Commerce, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Bureau of the Census, Donald J. Trump, Steven Dillingham were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF. (tp) Modified on 9/17/2020 (nd).
September 16, 2020 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (63 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF, 170 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Corrected Notice of Appeal. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF. (tp)
September 16, 2020 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (62 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF, 169 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Corrected Notice of Appeal. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF. (tp) Modified on 9/17/2020 (nd).
September 16, 2020 Filing 170 CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (61 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF, 168 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Notice of Appeal,, (164 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,,,,,, (165 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 55 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Judgment,,,,,,,. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Mauler, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 169 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (167 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 60 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Notice of Appeal,, (164 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Memorandum & Opinion, (165 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 55 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Judgment. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Mauler, Daniel) Modified on 9/17/2020 (tp).
September 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Mauler, Daniel to RE-FILE Document No. (61 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF, 168 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Notice of Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order/judgment being appealed was not selected. Re-file the appeal using the event type Corrected Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF(tp)
September 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Mauler, Daniel to RE-FILE Document No. (167 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 60 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Notice of Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order/judgment being appealed was not selected. Re-file the appeal using the event type Corrected Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF(tp)
September 16, 2020 Filing 168 FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Mauler, Daniel) Modified on 9/16/2020 (tp).
September 16, 2020 Filing 167 FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Mauler, Daniel) Modified on 9/16/2020 (tp).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ERRATA ORDER: The Court has substituted a new version of its September 10, 2020 Opinion and Order of at 20-CV-5770, ECF No. 164, to correct the following three typographical errors... (See ORDER.) (Signed by Judges Jesse M. Furman, Richard C. Wesley, and Peter W. Hall on 9/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF (ab)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION: Final judgment is entered for Plaintiffs and against Defendants on Plaintiffs' claims arising from an ultra vires violation of 2 U.S.C. 2a and 13 U.S.C. 141 (namely, the Fifth Claim for Relief in the Governmental Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Count Two in the NGO Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint). The July 21, 2020 Memorandum on Excluding Illegal Aliens from the Apportionment Base Following the 2020 Census (the "Presidential Memorandum"), announcing that it is the policy of the United States to exclude from the apportionment base aliens who are not in a lawful immigration status, is DECLARED unlawful as an ultra vires violation of Congress's delegation of authority to conduct the decennial census and apportionment calculation pursuant to 2 U.S.C. 2a and 13 U.S.C. 141. The Secretary of Commerce in his official capacity, the Director of the Census Bureau in his official capacity, the U.S. Department of Commerce, and the U.S. Census Bureau, and any successors to those offices, together with their agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and other persons who are in active concert or participation with the foregoing, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(d)(2), are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from including in the Secretary's report to the President pursuant to Section 141(b) any information permitting the President to exercise the President's discretion to carry out the policy set forth in section 2 of the Presidential Memorandum that is, any information concerning the number of aliens in each State who are not in a lawful immigration status under the Immigration and Nationality Act. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Wesley, Judge Peter W. Hall and Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/10/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF (kv)
September 10, 2020 Filing 164 OPINION AND ORDER re: #74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION]. filed by County of El Paso, City of Central Falls, City of Seattle, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, United States Conference of Mayors, State of Michigan, City of Phoenix, State of Vermont, City of Philadelphia, State of New Jersey, State of Illinois, Commonwealth of Virginia, ADC Research Institute, City of Providence, New York Immigration Coalition, State of North Carolina, State of Maine, State of Delaware, Howard County, City of Pittsburgh, CASA, City of New York, State of Maryland, FIEL Houston Inc, Make the Road New York, Casa, State of Hawaii, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Connecticut, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Nevada, County of Monterey, County of Hidalgo, State of Oregon, City of Columbus, District of Columbia, County of Cameron, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, State of Wisconsin, City and County of San Francisco, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Colorado, State of Washington, City of Chicago, #117 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Donald J. Trump, Steven Dillingham, Bureau of the Census, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., United States Department of Commerce. There is no dispute that the President has "accustomed supervisory powers over his executive officers," Franklin, 505 U.S. at 800, and thus retains some discretion in the conduct of the decennial census and resulting apportionment calculation. Nevertheless, where the authority of the President (or other members of the Executive Branch) to act is derived from statutes passed by Congress, the President must act in accordance with, and within the boundaries of, the authority that Congress has granted. For the reasons discussed above, we conclude that the President did not do so here and that the Presidential Memorandum is an ultra vires violation of Congress's delegation of its constitutional responsibility to count the whole number of persons in each State and to apportion members of the House of Representatives among the States according to their respective numbers under 2 U.S.C. 2a and 13 U.S.C. 141. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment with respect to their statutory ultra vires claims is GRANTED, Defendants (other than the President) are ENJOINED as set forth above, and the Presidential Memorandum is DECLARED unlawful. We need not and do not reach the merits of Plaintiffs' other claims and need not address their request, in the alternative, for a preliminary injunction. Finally, Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction is DENIED and their motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF Nos. 74 and 117 and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by United States Circuit Judge Richard C. Wesley, United States Circuit Judge Peter W. Hall and Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/10/20) (yv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Main Document 164 replaced on 9/14/2020) (ab).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #162 Motion for Miranda M. Cover to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
September 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #162 MOTION for Miranda M. Cover to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21545143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 8, 2020 Filing 162 MOTION for Miranda M. Cover to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21545143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of PHV Application, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order re: PHV Application).(Cover, Miranda)
September 3, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. (160 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 53 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) MOTION for Thomas Buser-Clancy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21460545. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (161 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 54 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) MOTION for Edgar Saldivar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21460727. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the motion to appear pro hac vice was spread to multiple civil cases;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the lead case and a separate Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in each case and pay the filing fee for each motion - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF(bcu)
September 2, 2020 Filing 161 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Edgar Saldivar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21460727. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ADC Research Institute, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, CASA, FIEL Houston Inc, Make the Road New York, Casa, New York Immigration Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Saldivar, Edgar) Modified on 9/3/2020 (bcu).
September 2, 2020 Filing 160 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas Buser-Clancy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21460545. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ADC Research Institute, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, CASA, FIEL Houston Inc, Make the Road New York, Casa, New York Immigration Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Buser-Clancy, Thomas) Modified on 9/3/2020 (bcu).
September 1, 2020 Filing 159 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sopan Joshi on behalf of Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Joshi, Sopan)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER. At the oral argument scheduled for September 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., the parties should be prepared to address the following topics and questions as further set forth in this Order. Each side should anticipate having 20-30 minutes for its oral argument. Only one lawyer from each side will be permitted to speak on a given issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by United States Circuit Judge Richard C. Wesley, United States Circuit Judge Peter W. Hall and Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/31/20) (yv)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion for Peter Eliasberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #156 MOTION for Peter Eliasberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21407133. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 156 MOTION for Peter Eliasberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21407133. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Peter Eliasberg, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order re Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Eliasberg, Peter)
August 31, 2020 Filing 155 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Naomi Vale on behalf of State of New York..(Vale, Judith)
August 28, 2020 Filing 154 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (117 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) MOTION to Dismiss . (Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss). Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Mauler, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 27, 2020 Filing 152 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from AUSA Allison Rovner dated August 27, 2020. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Rovner, Allison)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: On September 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., the parties shall appear by telephone for oral argument on their pending motions. At least twenty-four hours before the oral argument, Liaison Counsel shall provide to the Court (via Judge Furman's Chambers email) a list of counsel who will participate in the oral argument; no more than two lawyers per side may participate. The Court will provide to each Liaison Counsel information on how participating counsel can access the argument. Other counsel and members of the public may access the conference by calling 888-363-4749 and using access code 5421540#. That line will be on listen-only mode - that is, all callers will be muted. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman., Telephone Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman, Richard C. Wesley and Peter W. Hall on 8/27/2020) (ama)
August 25, 2020 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #117 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiffs' Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment or Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by ADC Research Institute, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, CASA, City and County of San Francisco, City of Central Falls, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, City of Providence, City of Seattle, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Cameron, County of El Paso, County of Hidalgo, County of Monterey, District of Columbia, FIEL Houston Inc, Howard County, Make the Road New York, Casa, New York Immigration Coalition, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Wisconsin, United States Conference of Mayors..(Colangelo, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 149 DECLARATION of Elena Goldstein in Support re: #74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION].. Document filed by ADC Research Institute, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, CASA, City and County of San Francisco, City of Central Falls, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, City of Providence, City of Seattle, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Cameron, County of El Paso, County of Hidalgo, County of Monterey, District of Columbia, FIEL Houston Inc, Howard County, Make the Road New York, Casa, New York Immigration Coalition, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Wisconsin, United States Conference of Mayors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 60 (Awawdeh Declaration), #2 Exhibit 61 (Mendelsohn Declaration), #3 Exhibit 62 (Supplemental Espinosa Declaration), #4 Exhibit 63 (Supplemental Oshiro Declaration), #5 Exhibit 64 (Supplemental Seon Declaration), #6 Exhibit 65 (Barreto Expert Reply Declaration), #7 Exhibit 66 (Thompson Expert Reply Declaration)).(Goldstein, Elena)
August 25, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Merrill Litt on behalf of County of Monterey..(Litt, William)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #146 Motion for Jennifer Marie Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #146 MOTION for Jennifer Marie Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of Michigan. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 25, 2020 Filing 146 MOTION for Jennifer Marie Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of Michigan. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit - Cert of Good Standing from Michigan Supreme Court, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Jackson, Jennifer)
August 25, 2020 Filing 145 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Konopka on behalf of District of Columbia..(Konopka, Kathleen)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #141 Motion for Robert Stanton Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #142 Motion for Daniel Frederick Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying without prejudice #126 Motion for Leave to Appear representing DC. If counsel is admitted in this District, counsel should enter a notice of appearance, not file a motion for leave to appear; if counsel is not admitted, counsel should file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice in the ordinary course. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #142 MOTION for Daniel Frederick Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21302029. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #141 MOTION for Robert Stanton Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21301788. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 24, 2020 Filing 142 MOTION for Daniel Frederick Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21302029. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Jacobson, #2 Certificate of Good Standing DC, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Jacobson, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 141 MOTION for Robert Stanton Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21301788. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Stanton Jones, #2 Certificate of Good Standing DC, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Jones, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #138 Motion for Jennifer Altman to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #139 Motion for Shani Rivaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #138 MOTION for Jennifer Altman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21297262. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #139 MOTION for Shani Rivaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21297370. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 24, 2020 Filing 139 MOTION for Shani Rivaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21297370. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The League of Women Voters of California, The League of Women Voters of Florida, The League of Women Voters of Texas, The League of Women Voters of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shani Rivaux, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rivaux, Shani)
August 24, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for Jennifer Altman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21297262. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The League of Women Voters of California, The League of Women Voters of Florida, The League of Women Voters of Texas, The League of Women Voters of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Altman, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Altman, Jennifer)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #135 Motion for William M. Litt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #134 Motion by Rebecca Hirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #135 MOTION for William M. Litt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 135 MOTION for William M. Litt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by County of Monterey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of William M. Litt In Support Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order).(Litt, William) Modified on 8/24/2020 (vba). Modified on 8/24/2020 (wb).
August 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #134 MOTION for Rebecca Hirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21294147. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 24, 2020 Filing 134 MOTION for Rebecca Hirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21294147. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit to support motion for pro hac vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Hirsch, Rebecca)
August 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. #133 MOTION for Rebecca Hirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (vba)
August 24, 2020 Filing 133 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Rebecca Hirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit to support motion for pro hac vice, #2 Exhibit Proposed order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of good standing).(Hirsch, Rebecca) Modified on 8/24/2020 (vba).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Dustin Chase-Woods to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #128 MOTION for Dustin Chase-Woods to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21274780. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Ashleigh K. Acevedo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 21, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #130 MOTION for Ashleigh K. Acevedo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21274927. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION for Ashleigh K. Acevedo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21274927. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The League of Women Voters of California, The League of Women Voters of Florida, The League of Women Voters of Texas, The League of Women Voters of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashleigh Acevedo, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Acevedo, Ashleigh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #127 Motion for Blaine I. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 21, 2020 Filing 128 MOTION for Dustin Chase-Woods to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21274780. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The League of Women Voters of California, The League of Women Voters of Florida, The League of Women Voters of Texas, The League of Women Voters of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dustin Chase - Woods, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Chase-Woods, Dustin)
August 21, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #127 MOTION for Blaine I. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21274413. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION for Blaine I. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21274413. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Erika Lee, The League of Women Voters of California, The League of Women Voters of Florida, The League of Women Voters of Texas, The League of Women Voters of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blaine I Green, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Green, Blaine)
August 21, 2020 Filing 126 MOTION for Leave to Appear representing DC . Document filed by District of Columbia..(Konopka, Kathleen)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #124 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. On August 20, 2020, the Immigration Reform Law Institute filed a letter-motion seeking leave to file an amicus brief. See ECF No. 124. The motion, filed on consent and/or without objection from the parties, is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 124. SO ORDERED. (Signed by United States Circuit Judge Richard C. Wesley, United States Circuit Judge Peter W. Hall, Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/21/20) (yv)
August 20, 2020 Filing 124 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Gina M. D'Andrea dated 08/20/2020. Document filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief).(D'Andrea, Gina)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Tsega Girma to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 20, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #122 MOTION for Tsega Girma to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21242101. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 20, 2020 Filing 122 MOTION for Tsega Girma to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21242101. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Howard County. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Court of Appeals of Maryland, #3 Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Girma, Tsega)
August 19, 2020 Filing 121 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #75 Rule 56.1 Statement,,,,. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Davis, Elliott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Albert E. Fontenot, Jr. in Opposition re: #74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION]., #117 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Davis, Elliott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 119 DECLARATION of John M. Abowd in Opposition re: #74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION]., #117 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 Supplement John M. Abowd Professional Resume).(Davis, Elliott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION]., #117 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Davis, Elliott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. Responses due by 8/25/2020 Return Date set for 8/28/2020 at 11:59 PM..(Davis, Elliott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Mauler on behalf of Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Mauler, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elliott Marc Davis on behalf of Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Davis, Elliott)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Gina Michele D'Andrea to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #113 MOTION for Gina Michele D'Andrea to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21207857. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION for Gina Michele D'Andrea to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21207857. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute..(D'Andrea, Gina)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #104 Motion for Mark Trachtenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #103 Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #105 Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting #106 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #108 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #110 Motion to File Amicus Brief. On August 14, 2020, four motions for leave to file amicus briefs were filed on behalf of a coalition of sixteen businesses and business organizations; the U.S. House of Representatives; the League of Women Voters of the United States (and state affiliates); and a group of scholars and historians of the census and immigration.1 All are on consent and/or without objection from the parties. All four motions are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF Nos. 103, 105, 106, 108, and 110. SO ORDERED. (Signed by United States Circuit Judge Richard C. Wesly, United States Circuit Judge Peter W. Hall and Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/17/20) (yv)
August 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #104 MOTION for Mark Trachtenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21165587. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 14, 2020 Filing 110 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Antony L. Ryan dated August 14, 2020. Document filed by Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalie Molina, Steven Ruggles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief).(Ryan, Antony)
August 14, 2020 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #108 CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of The League of Women Voters of the United States, The League of Women Voters of Texas, The League of Women Voters of Florida, and The League of Women Voters of California. . Document filed by The League of Women Voters of California, The League of Women Voters of Florida, The League of Women Voters of Texas, The League of Women Voters of the United States..(Sills, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 108 CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of The League of Women Voters of the United States, The League of Women Voters of Texas, The League of Women Voters of Florida, and The League of Women Voters of California. Document filed by The League of Women Voters of the United States, The League of Women Voters of Texas, The League of Women Voters of Florida, The League of Women Voters of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief).(Sills, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #106 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of The U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs / Notice of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief. . Document filed by U.S. House of Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed) Brief of The U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs).(Letter, Douglas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of The U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs / Notice of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief. Document filed by U.S. House of Representatives..(Letter, Douglas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 105 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #110) LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Antony L. Ryan dated August 14, 2020. Document filed by Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalie Molina, Steven Ruggles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief).(Ryan, Antony) Modified on 8/17/2020 (lb).
August 14, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION for Mark Trachtenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21165587. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalie Molina, Steven Ruggles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark Trachtenberg and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Ryan, Antony)
August 14, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs. Document filed by 16 Businesses and Business Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Southwell, Alexander)
August 14, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Morgan Wesneski on behalf of 16 Businesses and Business Organizations..(Wesneski, Joshua)
August 14, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Ross Crain on behalf of 16 Businesses and Business Organizations..(Crain, Lee)
August 14, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander H. Southwell on behalf of 16 Businesses and Business Organizations..(Southwell, Alexander)
August 14, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Helam Gebremariam on behalf of Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalie Molina, Steven Ruggles..(Gebremariam, Helam)
August 14, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Antony L Ryan on behalf of Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalie Molina, Steven Ruggles..(Ryan, Antony)
August 14, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard W Clary on behalf of Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalie Molina, Steven Ruggles..(Clary, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting (93) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:20-cv-05770-JMF; granting (49) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:20-cv-05781-JMF. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Court reminds the parties and amici that because 20-CV-5770 and 20-CV-5781 have been consolidated, filings should be made only in 20-CV-5770. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate 20-CV-5770, ECF No. 93, and 20-CV-5781, ECF No. 49. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/14/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF (yv)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting in part #91 Letter Motion for Extension of Time of the briefing schedule. The briefing schedule, see ECF No. #53 , is hereby modified as follows: Defendants shall file their combined opposition and cross-motion by August 19, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their combined reply and opposition by August 25, 2020; and Defendants shall file their reply by August 28, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 14, 2020 Filing 94 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Matthew Colangelo dated August 14, 2020 re: #91 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of the briefing schedule addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from AUSA Allison Rovner dated August 13, 2020. . Document filed by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Colangelo, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 93 CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of Members of Congress. Document filed by Brian Schatz, Richard Blumenthal, Sherrod Brown, Martin Heinrich, Mazie K. Hirono, Jeffrey A. Merkley, Elizabeth Warren, Ron L. Wyden. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Leave To File, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Gans, David)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER with respect to #91 Letter Motion for Extension of Time of the briefing schedule: Plaintiffs shall file any response by noon tomorrow. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 13, 2020 Filing 91 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of the briefing schedule addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from AUSA Allison Rovner dated August 13, 2020. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Rovner, Allison)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Motion for John Daniel Reaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #89 MOTION for John Daniel Reaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 13, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION for John Daniel Reaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United States Conference of Mayors. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notarized Affidavit-Good Standing, #2 Exhibit DC Bar Certificate,Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Reaves, John)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Ann E. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #87 MOTION for Ann E. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 12, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for Ann E. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Lynch, Ann)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. On August 10, 2020, Chief Circuit Judge Robert A. Katzmann appointed a three-judge panel to hear this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(b)(1). See ECF Nos. 82-83. Section 2284(b)(3) provides, in relevant part, that [a] single judge may conduct all proceedings except the trial, and with specified exceptions not yet relevant here enter all orders permitted by the rules of civil procedure. Nevertheless, mindful that the three-judge requirement in 28 U.S.C. 2284 is jurisdictional, Kalson v. Paterson, 542 F.3d 281, 287 (2d Cir. 2008), and for avoidance of any doubt, the Court hereby adopts the orders previously entered in this matter, including but not limited to the scheduling order of August 5, 2020, see ECF No. 53, and the consolidation order of August 4, 2020, see ECF No. 43. Further, the Court grants to Judge Furman authority to act on the Court's behalf with respect to any pro hac vice motions filed in this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman, United States Circuit Judge Richard C. Wesley and United States Circuit Judge Peter W. Hall on 8/12/20) (yv)
August 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #85 MOTION for John Daniel Reaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21103182. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): AFFIDAVIT NOT NOTARIZED;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
August 11, 2020 Filing 85 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John Daniel Reaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21103182. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by United States Conference of Mayors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Good Standinga, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Reaves, John) Modified on 8/11/2020 (vba).
August 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #84 MOTION for Ann E. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21101391. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): AFFIDAVIT IS NOT NOTARIZED; CAPTIONED FOR 2 SEPARATE CASES;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
August 11, 2020 Filing 84 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ann E. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21101391. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Lynch, Ann) Modified on 8/11/2020 (vba).
August 10, 2020 Filing 83 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 20-2630. ROBERT A. KATZMANN, Chief Circuit Judge: Having received a #68 request from United States District Judge Jesse M. Furman to appoint a three-judge panel to hear the above-mentioned matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(b)(1), I hereby designate United States Circuit Judge Richard C. Wesley and United States Circuit Judge Peter W. Hall to serve as members of the Court to hear and determine the action. Robert A. Katzmann, Chief Circuit Judge. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/10/2020..(nd) Modified on 8/10/2020 (nd).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 20-2630. ROBERT A. KATZMANN, Chief Circuit Judge: Having received a #68 request from United States District Judge Jesse M. Furman to appoint a three-judge panel to hear the above-mentioned matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(b)(1), I hereby designate United States Circuit Judge Richard C. Wesley and United States Circuit Judge Peter W. Hall to serve as members of the Court to hear and determine the action. Robert A. Katzmann, Chief Circuit Judge. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 08/10/2020..(nd) Modified on 8/10/2020 (nd).
August 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #81 MOTION for Rebecca Hirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21076283. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF ILLINOIS;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
August 10, 2020 Filing 81 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Rebecca Hirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21076283. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit to support motion for pro hac vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Hirsch, Rebecca) Modified on 8/10/2020 (vba).
August 10, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/5/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 10, 2020 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/5/2020 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/31/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Richard N. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 7, 2020 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION]. . Document filed by ADC Research Institute, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, CASA, City and County of San Francisco, City of Central Falls, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, City of Providence, City of Seattle, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Cameron, County of El Paso, County of Hidalgo, County of Monterey, District of Columbia, FIEL Houston Inc, Howard County, Make the Road New York, Casa, New York Immigration Coalition, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Wisconsin, United States Conference of Mayors..(Colangelo, Matthew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Matthew Colangelo in Support re: #74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION].. Document filed by ADC Research Institute, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, CASA, City and County of San Francisco, City of Central Falls, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, City of Providence, City of Seattle, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Cameron, County of El Paso, County of Hidalgo, County of Monterey, District of Columbia, FIEL Houston Inc, Howard County, Make the Road New York, Casa, New York Immigration Coalition, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Wisconsin, United States Conference of Mayors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59).(Colangelo, Matthew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 75 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by ADC Research Institute, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, CASA, City and County of San Francisco, City of Central Falls, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, City of Providence, City of Seattle, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Cameron, County of El Paso, County of Hidalgo, County of Monterey, District of Columbia, FIEL Houston Inc, Howard County, Make the Road New York, Casa, New York Immigration Coalition, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Wisconsin, United States Conference of Mayors..(Colangelo, Matthew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION]. Document filed by ADC Research Institute, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, CASA, City and County of San Francisco, City of Central Falls, City of Chicago, City of Columbus, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, City of Providence, City of Seattle, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Cameron, County of El Paso, County of Hidalgo, County of Monterey, District of Columbia, FIEL Houston Inc, Howard County, Make the Road New York, Casa, New York Immigration Coalition, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Wisconsin, United States Conference of Mayors..(Colangelo, Matthew)
August 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #73 MOTION for Richard N. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 7, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for Richard N. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Columbus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Coglianese, Richard)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Lara Baker-Morrish to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. (46 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) MOTION for Richard N. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21054338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the motion to appear pro hac vice was spread to multiple civil cases;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the lead case and a separate Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in each case and pay the filing fee for each motion - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF(bcu)
August 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #71 MOTION for Lara Baker-Morrish to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21054828. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 7, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Lara Baker-Morrish to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21054828. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Columbus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion).(Baker-Morrish, Lara)
August 7, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Ross Haren on behalf of State of New York..(Haren, Eric)
August 7, 2020 Filing 69 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Richard N. Coglianese to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21054338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Columbus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF.(Coglianese, Richard) Modified on 8/7/2020 (bcu).
August 7, 2020 Filing 68 REQUEST TO THE CHIEF JUDGE OF THE U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT FOR APPOINTMENT OF A THREE-JUDGE PANEL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2248(b) granting #58 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiffs request is GRANTED, substantially for the two reasons set forth in their letter-motion. Accordingly, and substantially for the reasons set forth in Plaintiffs letter-motion, the Court respectfully requests that the Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit promptly appoint a three-judge panel to preside over the claims presented by this litigation. Should the Chief Judge of the Second Circuit need any additional information or have any inquiries, this Court is available any time. Respectfully Submitted. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/7/20) (yv) Transmission to Appeals Clerk. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Susan P. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #64 MOTION for Susan P. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21037049. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 6, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez on behalf of ADC Research Institute, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, CASA, FIEL Houston Inc, Make the Road New York, Casa, New York Immigration Coalition..(Gomez Hernandez, Julia)
August 6, 2020 Filing 65 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from AUSA Allison Rovner dated August 6, 2020 re: #58 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' request for a statutory three-judge court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284 addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Matthew Colangelo dated August 5, 2020. . Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Rovner, Allison)
August 6, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Susan P. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21037049. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Maine. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Susan P. Herman, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Herman, Susan)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #61 MOTION for Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21036079. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 6, 2020 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,, against Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce.Document filed by American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Make the Road New York, Casa, CASA, ADC Research Institute, New York Immigration Coalition. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,..(Ho, Dale)
August 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Dale E. Ho to RE-FILE Document No. #57 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
August 6, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21036079. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New Mexico Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Maestas, Tania)
August 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #60 MOTION for Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit not notarized. Please refile entire motion and make the affidavit is notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 6, 2020 Filing 60 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New Mexico Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Maestas, Tania) Modified on 8/6/2020 (bcu).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Steven C. Kilpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #55 Motion for Eric R. Olson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 5, 2020 Filing 58 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' request for a statutory three-judge court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284 addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Matthew Colangelo dated August 5, 2020. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 57 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Make the Road New York, Casa, CASA, ADC Research Institute, New York Immigration Coalition.Document filed by American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Make the Road New York, Casa, CASA, ADC Research Institute, New York Immigration Coalition. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Ho, Dale) Modified on 8/6/2020 (sj).
August 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #56 MOTION for William M. Litt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21015224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
August 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #54 MOTION for Steven C. Kilpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21015127. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #55 MOTION for ERIC R. OLSON to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21015172. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 5, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for William M. Litt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21015224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by County of Monterey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of William M. Litt, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Litt, William)
August 5, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for ERIC R. OLSON to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21015172. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Colorado. Return Date set for 8/5/2020 at 05:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Olson, Eric)
August 5, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Steven C. Kilpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21015127. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Steven C. Kilpatrick In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order).(Kilpatrick, Steven)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, As stated on the record during today's telephone conference, the Court adopts the following deadlines: No later than today, August 5, 2020, (1) the NYIC Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint and (2) Plaintiffs shall file a request for a panel of three judges pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284. No later August 6, 2020, Defendants shall file a letter with the Court indicating their position on the request for a three-judge panel. No later than August 7, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, for a preliminary injunction. Their memorandum of law may not exceed fifty-five pages. No later than August 17, 2020, Defendants shall file their combined opposition to Plaintiffs' motion(s) and their cross-motion to dismiss. Their memorandum of law may not exceed fifty-five pages. No later than August 24, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file a combined reply in support of their motion(s) and opposition to Defendants' cross-motion. Their memorandum of law may not exceed thirty pages. No later than August 27, 2020, Defendants shall file any reply in support of their cross-motion, which may not exceed ten pages. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2020., Cross Motions due by 8/17/2020., Motions due by 8/7/2020., Responses due by 8/24/2020, Replies due by 8/27/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/5/20) (yv)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Laura K. Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #51 Motion for Dennis J. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Initial Pretrial Conference held via teleconference on 8/5/2020. Matthew Colangelo (Liaison Counsel), Elena Goldstein (for State of N.Y.), Dale Ho (for N.Y.I.C.) present for Plaintiffs. Allison Rovner (Liaison Counsel) and Jeffrey Oestericher present for Defendants. Court reporter present. -- See transcript. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF (ab)
August 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Dennis J. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #49 MOTION for Laura K. Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 5, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Dennis J. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis J. Herrera in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Herrera, Dennis)
August 5, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian R. Kaplan on behalf of County of El Paso..(Kaplan, Ian)
August 4, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Laura K. Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing).(Clinton, Laura)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Jacob Campion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #41 Motion for Vanessa L. Kassab to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #42 Motion for Jeffrey VanDam to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #44 Motion for Matthew T. Jerzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #47 Motion for Erin L. Kuka to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
August 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #47 MOTION for Erin L. Kuka to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20993659. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 4, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Erin L. Kuka to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20993659. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF ERIN L. KUKA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, #2 Exhibit Ceritficat of Good Standing - CA, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - HI, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Kuka, Erin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Alexander de Haan on behalf of State of Oregon..(de Haan, Brian)
August 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #45 MOTION for Jennifer M. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of Michigan. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20992753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Michigan. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registration coming from this state.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #44 MOTION for Matthew T. Jerzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20992824. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 4, 2020 Filing 45 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer M. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice for State of Michigan. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20992753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Jackson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/4/2020 (bcu).
August 4, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Matthew T. Jerzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20992824. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Central Falls. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Jerzyk, Matthew)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re: (42 in 1:20-cv-05781-JMF) Letter, filed by Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Donald J. Trump, Steven Dillingham, (37 in 1:20-cv-05770-JMF) Letter, filed by United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Steven Dillingham, Donald J. Trump. In their joint later dated August 3, 2020, the parties state that they agree that 20 Civ. 5770 and 20 Civ. 5781 should be consolidated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2). 20-CV- 5770, ECF No. 37, at 1; 20-CV-5781, ECF No. 42, at 1. In light of that, and because the actions involve common questions of law and fact, it is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 42(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the two cases are consolidated under the case number 20-CV-5770 (JMF). The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate 20- CV-5770 (JMF) and 20-CV-5781 (JMF) under case number 20-CV-5770 (JMF), and to close 20-CV-5781 (JMF). All future filings should be in 20-CV-5770 (JMF) alone. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/4/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05770-JMF, 1:20-cv-05781-JMF (nb)
August 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for Jeffrey VanDam to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20990169. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 4, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Jeffrey VanDam to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20990169. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(VanDam, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 AMENDED MOTION for Jacob Campion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #41 MOTION for Vanessa L. Kassab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20988981. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 4, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Vanessa L. Kassab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20988981. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Delaware..(Kassab, Vanessa)
August 4, 2020 Filing 40 AMENDED MOTION for Jacob Campion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Campion, Jacob)
August 3, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heidi Parry Stern on behalf of State of Nevada..(Stern, Heidi)
August 3, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher on behalf of Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Oestericher, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2020 Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from AUSA Allison Rovner dated August 3, 2020 re: joint submission for initial conference. Document filed by Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Rovner, Allison)
August 3, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Rovner on behalf of Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce..(Rovner, Allison)
August 3, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Morenike Fajana on behalf of State of New York..(Fajana, Morenike)
August 3, 2020 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,, against Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce.Document filed by County of El Paso, County of Cameron, State of Washington, State of Illinois, City of Philadelphia, State of Colorado, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of New York, State of Rhode Island, City and County of San Francisco, State of Oregon, City of New York, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, State of New Mexico, Commonwealth of Virginia, City of Columbus, State of Michigan, City of Seattle, County of Monterey, State of Minnesota, City of Central Falls, City of Chicago, State of New Jersey, City of Providence, State of Hawaii, State of Connecticut, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Nevada, State of North Carolina, State of Maryland, State of Delaware, County of Hidalgo, State of Vermont, District of Columbia, United States Conference of Mayors, State of Maine, State of Wisconsin, Howard County. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Presidential Memorandum)).(Goldstein, Elena)
August 3, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #33 MOTION for Matthew T. Jerzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid; Attorney Affidavit not notarized. PLease rsubmit and make sure your affidavit is notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (bcu)
July 31, 2020 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Matthew T. Jerzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Central Falls. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Jerzyk, Matthew) Modified on 8/3/2020 (bcu).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' joint letter of earlier today, see 20-CV-5770 (JMF), ECF No. 31, the initial pretrial conference in these cases which will be held remotely by telephone is RESCHEDULED for Wednesday, August 5, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. The deadline for the parties' joint letter required by the Court's Order of July 28, 2020, see 20-CV-5770 (JMF), ECF No. 24, is MOVED to Monday, August 3, 2020, at 5:00 p.m... Members of the public and any counsel who will not have a speaking role during the conference may access the conference by calling 888-363-4749 and using access code 5421540#. That line will be on listen-only mode that is, all callers will be muted. (See ORDER.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/31/2020) (ab)
July 31, 2020 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Matthew Colangelo dated July 31, 2020 re: Plaintiffs' joint notice regarding intent to seek relief. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fiona Jeannette Kaye on behalf of State of New York..(Kaye, Fiona)
July 28, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Michael Bloom on behalf of City of New York..(Bloom, Aaron)
July 28, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #28 MOTION for Jacob Campion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20888526. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order; AFFIDAVIT NOT NOTARIZED;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
July 28, 2020 Filing 28 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jacob Campion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20888526. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Good Standing).(Campion, Jacob) Modified on 7/28/2020 (vba).
July 28, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Matthew Colangelo dated July 28, 2020 re: proof of service to Defendants' counsel of the Court's July 28, 2020 Order. Document filed by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Colangelo, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Daniel Battles on behalf of State of Vermont..(Battles, Benjamin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Timothy Jerzyk on behalf of City of Central Falls..(Jerzyk, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Yesterday, the S.D.N.Y. Assignment Committee determined that, pursuant to Rule 13 of the S.D.N.Y. Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges, these two cases should be assigned to the undersigned as related to State of New York v. U.S. Department of Commerce, 18-CV-2921 (JMF).... Given the time sensitivities involved with the issues in this case, and the inability to safely convene for an in-person conference in light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will hold an initial pretrial conference with all parties by telephone on Thursday, August 13, 2020, at 2:15 p.m.... (See ORDER.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/28/2020) (ab)
July 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aimee D. Thomson on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania..(Thomson, Aimee)
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Perry on behalf of State of Connecticut..(Perry, Joshua)
July 27, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bureau of the Census served on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020; Steven Dillingham served on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020; Wilbur L. Ross Jr. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020; Donald J. Trump served on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020; United States Department of Commerce served on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting, on consent, #18 Letter Motion for Leave to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marie Soueid on behalf of State of New Jersey..(Soueid, Marie)
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File motion to permit service of the summons and complaint by email addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Matthew Colangelo dated July 27, 2020. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
July 27, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 27, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-02921-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wilbur L. Ross Jr...(pc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Dillingham..(pc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Commerce..(pc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump..(pc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bureau of the Census..(pc)
July 27, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Dennis J. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20863647. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): AFFIDAVIT IS NOT NOTARIZED;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Dennis J. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20863647. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Herrera, Dennis) Modified on 7/27/2020 (vba).
July 27, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 18cv2921. (pc)
July 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
July 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Matthew Colangelo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: County of El Paso, County of Cameron, State of Washington, State of Illinois, City of Philadelphia, State of Colorado, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of New York, State of Rhode Island, City and County of San Francisco, State of Oregon, City of New York, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, State of New Mexico, Commonwealth of Virginia, City of Columbus, State of Michigan, City of Seattle, County of Monterey, State of Minnesota, City of Central Falls, City of Chicago, State of New Jersey, City of Providence, State of Hawaii, State of Connecticut, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Nevada, State of North Carolina, State of Maryland, State of Delaware, County of Hidalgo, State of Vermont, District of Columbia,Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was removed; do not include party names as party text. (pc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Wu-Kung Pfautz on behalf of City of Philadelphia..(Pfautz, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wilbur L. Ross Jr., in his official capacity as Secretary of Commerce, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Dillingham, in his official capacity as Director of the United States Census Bureau, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Commerce, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bureau of the Census, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by State of New York..(Colangelo, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Matthew McLean on behalf of State of Hawaii..(McLean, Nicholas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-2921 (JMF). Document filed by State of New York..(Goldstein, Elena)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldstein, Elena)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elena Stacy Goldstein on behalf of State of New York..(Goldstein, Elena)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of the Census, Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross Jr., Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Commerce. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20838691)Document filed by County of El Paso, County of Cameron, State of Washington, State of Illinois, City of Philadelphia, State of Colorado, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of New York, State of Rhode Island, City and County of San Francisco, State of Oregon, City of New York, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, State of New Mexico, Commonwealth of Virginia, City of Columbus, State of Michigan, City of Seattle, County of Monterey, State of Minnesota, City of Central Falls, City of Chicago, State of New Jersey, City of Providence, State of Hawaii, State of Connecticut, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Nevada, State of North Carolina, State of Maryland, State of Delaware, County of Hidalgo, State of Vermont, District of Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Presidential Memorandum of July 21, 2020)).(Colangelo, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Jacob Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Joshua Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Tania Maestas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Providence
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Hidalgo
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Battles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Columbus
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Lara Baker-Morrish
Represented By: Richard Coglianese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Brian Alexander de Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Erin Lee Kuka
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Eric Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Jeffrey VanDam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Aimee D. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Philadelphia
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Michael Wu-Kung Pfautz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Miranda M. Cover
Represented By: Ann E. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Chicago
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Rebecca Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Central Falls
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Matthew Timothy Jerzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Kathleen Konopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Cameron
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of New York
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Pittsburgh
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Monterey
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: William Merrill Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Vanessa L Kassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of El Paso
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Ian R. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Eric Ross Haren
Represented By: Morenike Fajana
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Represented By: Fiona Jeannette Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Nicholas Matthew McLean
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Phoenix
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard County
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Tsega Girma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Susan P. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: Steven Carl Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Conference of Mayors
Represented By: Elena Stacy Goldstein
Represented By: John Daniel Reaves, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Represented By: Daniel Mauler
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher
Represented By: Elliott Marc Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur L. Ross Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Mauler
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher
Represented By: Elliott Marc Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dillingham
Represented By: Daniel Mauler
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher
Represented By: Elliott Marc Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of the Census
Represented By: Daniel Mauler
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher
Represented By: Elliott Marc Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Daniel Mauler
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher
Represented By: Elliott Marc Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Make the Road New York, Casa
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sarah E. Brannon
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Perry Grossman
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Davin Mckay Rosborough
Represented By: Adriel Ivan Cepeda Derieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: FIEL Houston Inc
Represented By: Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Perry Grossman
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: ADC Research Institute
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sarah E. Brannon
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Perry Grossman
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Davin Mckay Rosborough
Represented By: Adriel Ivan Cepeda Derieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: New York Immigration Coalition
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sarah E. Brannon
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: Peter Eliasberg
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Perry Grossman
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Davin Mckay Rosborough
Represented By: Adriel Ivan Cepeda Derieux
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sarah E. Brannon
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Perry Grossman
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Davin Mckay Rosborough
Represented By: Adriel Ivan Cepeda Derieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: CASA
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sarah E. Brannon
Represented By: Jonathan Topaz
Represented By: Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Represented By: Perry Grossman
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Davin Mckay Rosborough
Represented By: Adriel Ivan Cepeda Derieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The League of Women Voters of the United States
Represented By: Blaine I. Green
Represented By: Ashleigh K Acevedo
Represented By: Jennifer G. Altman
Represented By: Shani Rivaux
Represented By: Robert L. Sills
Represented By: Dustin Chase-Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 16 Businesses and Business Organizations
Represented By: Joshua Morgan Wesneski
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Lee Ross Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The League of Women Voters of California
Represented By: Blaine I. Green
Represented By: Ashleigh K Acevedo
Represented By: Jennifer G. Altman
Represented By: Shani Rivaux
Represented By: Robert L. Sills
Represented By: Dustin Chase-Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. House of Representatives
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Libby Garland
Represented By: Antony L Ryan
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andrew Beveridge
Represented By: Antony L Ryan
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Attorney General Richard Blumenthal
Represented By: David H. Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mazie K. Hirono
Represented By: David H. Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sherrod Brown
Represented By: David H. Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brian Schatz
Represented By: David H. Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elizabeth Warren
Represented By: David H. Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Natalie Molina
Represented By: Antony L Ryan
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ron L. Wyden
Represented By: David H. Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeffrey A. Merkley
Represented By: David H. Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The League of Women Voters of Florida
Represented By: Blaine I. Green
Represented By: Ashleigh K Acevedo
Represented By: Jennifer G. Altman
Represented By: Shani Rivaux
Represented By: Robert L. Sills
Represented By: Dustin Chase-Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Margo Anderson
Represented By: Antony L Ryan
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steven Ruggles
Represented By: Antony L Ryan
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Martin Heinrich
Represented By: David H. Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: J. Morgan Kousser
Represented By: Antony L Ryan
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Erika Lee
Represented By: Antony L Ryan
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Blaine I. Green
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The League of Women Voters of Texas
Represented By: Blaine I. Green
Represented By: Ashleigh K Acevedo
Represented By: Jennifer G. Altman
Represented By: Shani Rivaux
Represented By: Robert L. Sills
Represented By: Dustin Chase-Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rachel Buff
Represented By: Antony L Ryan
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Gina D'Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?