The Legacy Agency, Inc. v. Scoffield et al
Plaintiff: The Legacy Agency, Inc.
Defendant: Meghan Whelan, Chris Amezquita and Brodie Scoffield
Amicus Curiae: Major League Baseball Players Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv05771
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion to Seal. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/14/2020) (ks)
September 11, 2020 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Reade W. Seligmann re: #24 Brief, . Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted)).(Seligmann, Reade)
September 11, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE re: #24 Brief, (Redacted). Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan..(Kaiser, Adam)
September 11, 2020 Filing 38 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Reade W. Seligmann re: #24 Brief, . Document filed by Meghan Whelan, Brodie Scoffield, Chris Amezquita, Major League Baseball Players Association, The Legacy Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #36 .(Seligmann, Reade)
September 11, 2020 Filing 37 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE re: #24 Brief, . Document filed by Meghan Whelan, Brodie Scoffield, Chris Amezquita, Major League Baseball Players Association, The Legacy Agency, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #36 .(Kaiser, Adam)
September 11, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendants' Brief in Response to Amicus Brief and Exhibit A to the Declaration of Reade W. Seligmann addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Reade W. Seligmann dated September 11, 2020. Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan..(Seligmann, Reade)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion to Seal. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/31/2020) (ks)
August 28, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, Cross Petition (Redacted). Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan..(Kaiser, Adam)
August 28, 2020 Filing 33 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, Cross Petition. Document filed by Meghan Whelan, Brodie Scoffield, Chris Amezquita, Major League Baseball Players Association, The Legacy Agency, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #30 .(Kaiser, Adam)
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Reade W. Seligmann in Support re: #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim,. Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted)).(Seligmann, Reade)
August 28, 2020 Filing 31 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Reade W. Seligmann in Support re: #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim,. Document filed by Meghan Whelan, Brodie Scoffield, Chris Amezquita, Major League Baseball Players Association, The Legacy Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #30 .(Seligmann, Reade)
August 28, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION to Seal Defendants/Respondents' Brief in Further Support of Cross-Petition to Vacate Arbitral Award and Exhibit A to the Declaration of Reade W. Seligmann addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Reade W. Seligmann dated August 28, 2020. Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan..(Seligmann, Reade)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/24/2020) (ks)
August 24, 2020 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent GSE Worldwide Inc. for The Legacy Agency, Inc., The Legacy Agency, Inc.. Document filed by The Legacy Agency, Inc...(Kaplan, Howard)
August 24, 2020 Filing 27 REDACTION to #24 Brief, by Major League Baseball Players Association.(Joyce, Eamon)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion to Seal: Application granted. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/21/2020) (jwh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Amicus Brief addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Adam J. Kaiser dated August 21, 2020. Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan..(Kaiser, Adam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 24 ***SELECTED PARTIES***PROPOSED BRIEF re: #22 LETTER MOTION to Seal /Leave to File Brief With Redactions and Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Eamon P. Joyce dated August 21, 2020. Proposed Unredacted Amicus Curiae Brief. Document filed by Major League Baseball Players Association, Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, The Legacy Agency, Inc., Meghan Whelan.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #22 .(Joyce, Eamon)
August 21, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED BRIEF re: #22 LETTER MOTION to Seal /Leave to File Brief With Redactions and Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Eamon P. Joyce dated August 21, 2020. Proposed Redacted Amicus Curiae Brief. Document filed by Major League Baseball Players Association..(Joyce, Eamon)
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION to Seal /Leave to File Brief With Redactions and Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Eamon P. Joyce dated August 21, 2020. Document filed by Major League Baseball Players Association..(Joyce, Eamon)
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Major League Baseball Players Association..(Joyce, Eamon)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eamon Paul Joyce on behalf of Major League Baseball Players Association..(Joyce, Eamon)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #17 Letter filed by The Legacy Agency, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The corrected opposition is accepted for filing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/18/2020) (rro)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Seal. Application granted. The documents will remain under seal at this time, subject to any applications to unseal the documents. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/17/2020) (ks)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Howard J. Kaplan dated 08/17/2020 re: TLA Consents to the Request to Seal the MLBPA Confidential Arbitration Award. Document filed by The Legacy Agency, Inc...(Kaplan, Howard)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 ***SELECTED PARTIES***AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #15 Memorandum of Law in Opposition, to Respondents Cross Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and in Reply in Further Support of Verified Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. Document filed by The Legacy Agency, Inc., Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #14 .(Kaplan, Howard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Respondents Cross Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and in Reply in Further Support of Verified Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. Document filed by The Legacy Agency, Inc., Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit P1, #3 Exhibit P2)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #14 .(Kaplan, Howard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Adam J. Kaiser dated August 14, 2020. Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kaiser, Adam)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by The Legacy Agency, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Brief due by 8/21/2020. Motions due by 8/21/2020.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/10/2020) (mml)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Howard J. Kaplan dated 08/07/2020 re: Write to Advise Court. Document filed by The Legacy Agency, Inc...(Kaplan, Howard)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties herein as follows: 1. Petitioner TLA will serve and file any opposition to the Cross-Petition and reply in further support of its Verified Petition on or before August 14, 2020; 2. Respondents will serve and file any reply in further support of their Cross-Petition on or before August 28, 2020; 3. The Parties hereby agree that filing by ECF and sending by email to the undersigned counsel shall constitute good and effective service on the respective parties with respect to the Verified Petition, the Cross-Petition and all other papers contemplated herein. 4. The Parties have consented to this briefing schedule and there has been no previous request for an extension. The proposed briefing schedule does not affect any other scheduled dates. 5. This Stipulation may be executed in one or more counterparts, and a PDF or facsimile copy thereof shall be treated in the same manner as an original for all purposes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/31/2020) ( Responses due by 8/14/2020, Replies due by 8/24/2020.) (ks)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The Legacy Agency, Inc...(Kaplan, Howard)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chandni Roy on behalf of The Legacy Agency, Inc...(Roy, Chandni)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Jay Kaplan on behalf of The Legacy Agency, Inc...(Kaplan, Howard)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer with Counterclaims served on Plaintiff on July 29, 2020. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan..(Kaiser, Adam)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)., COUNTERCLAIM against The Legacy Agency, Inc.. Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Meghan Whelan, Brodie Scoffield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supreme Court Decision and Order, #2 Exhibit B - Agent Regulations, #3 Exhibit C - Arbitration Order, #4 Exhibit D - Arbitration Order, #5 Exhibit E - Arbitration Order).(Kaiser, Adam)
July 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reade William Seligmann on behalf of Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan..(Seligmann, Reade)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Campbell on behalf of Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan..(Campbell, Steven)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaiser, Adam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam J. Kaiser on behalf of Chris Amezquita, Brodie Scoffield, Meghan Whelan..(Kaiser, Adam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653064/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20839012).Document filed by Chris Amezquita, Meghan Whelan, Brodie Scoffield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11).(Kaiser, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Legacy Agency, Inc. v. Scoffield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Whelan
Represented By: Steven Campbell
Represented By: Reade William Seligmann
Represented By: Adam J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Amezquita
Represented By: Steven Campbell
Represented By: Reade William Seligmann
Represented By: Adam J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brodie Scoffield
Represented By: Steven Campbell
Represented By: Reade William Seligmann
Represented By: Adam J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Legacy Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Jay Kaplan
Represented By: Chandni Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Major League Baseball Players Association
Represented By: Eamon Paul Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?