Hartmann v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Ralf Hartmann and Ralf Hartmann
Defendant: Google LLC and YouTube LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05778
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Google LLC answer due 10/13/2020; YouTube LLC answer due 10/13/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from A. John P. Mancini dated September 3, 2020. Document filed by Google LLC, YouTube LLC..(Mancini, A.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by A. John P. Mancini on behalf of Google LLC, YouTube LLC..(Mancini, A.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Adrienne Slavin on behalf of Google LLC, YouTube LLC..(Slavin, Sara)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(dnh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lebowitz, Marc)
July 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Marc Andrew Lebowitz Document No. 4 belonging to case 1:20-cv-04923-VSB that was incorrectly filed in case 1:20-cv-05778-ER on 07/27/2020. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the AO 121 Copyright form was filed in the wrong case. (dnh)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google LLC, YouTube LLC..(dnh)
July 27, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 4 AO 121 Form Copyright. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (dnh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Google LLC, YouTube LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ralf Hartmann..(Lebowitz, Marc)
July 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Marc Andrew Lebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Andrew Lebowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lebowitz, Marc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google LLC, YouTube LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20841942)Document filed by Ralf Hartmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Lebowitz, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartmann v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Ralf Hartmann
Represented By: Marc Andrew Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralf Hartmann
Represented By: Marc Andrew Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Sara Adrienne Slavin
Represented By: A. John P. Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Sara Adrienne Slavin
Represented By: A. John P. Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?