Douramanis v. Dur-America Brokerage Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Krina Douramanis
Defendant: George Douramanis and DUR-AMERICA BROKERAGE INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05825
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the respective parties herein, that the time for Defendants DUR-AMERICA BROKERAGE INC. and GEORGE DOURAMANIS to appear, answer or move with respect to the Complaint in this action is extended up to and including October 21, 2020. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Miranda Slone Sklarin Verveniotis LLP will accept service of the Summons and Complaint on behalf of Defendants DUR-AMERICA BROKERAGE INC. and GEORGE DOURAMANIS. The parties are directed to review my individual rules in civil cases, which outlines that requests for extension may not be made by joint stipulation. Future requests for extension shall comply with my individual rules. (George Douramanis answer due 10/21/2020; Dur-America Brokerage Inc. answer due 10/21/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/27/2020) (rro) Modified on 8/28/2020 (rro).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by George Douramanis, Dur-America Brokerage Inc...(Miranda, Michael)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dur-America Brokerage Inc...(pc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Douramanis..(pc)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Douramanis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Krina Douramanis..(Holzberg, Zachary)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dur-America Brokerage Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Krina Douramanis..(Holzberg, Zachary)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Holzberg, Zachary)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Miranda on behalf of George Douramanis, Dur-America Brokerage Inc...(Miranda, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (SEE #3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Miranda on behalf of George Douramanis, Dur-America Brokerage Inc...(Miranda, Michael) Modified on 8/7/2020 (kj).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Zachary Ian Holzberg. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Zachary Ian Holzberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dur-America Brokerage Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUR-AMERICA BROKERAGE INC., George Douramanis. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-20868105)Document filed by Krina Douramanis..(Holzberg, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douramanis v. Dur-America Brokerage Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Douramanis
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUR-AMERICA BROKERAGE INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krina Douramanis
Represented By: Zachary Ian Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?