Harel FF, LP v. Amadeus 140 LLC et al
Plaintiff: HAREL FF, LP
Defendant: Haroutiun Derderian, NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE, 37 TOWNHOUSE LENDER LLC, Harry Derderian, New York City Department Of Finance;, AMADEUS 140 LLC, New York City Environmental Control Board, John Doe #1 through John Doe #12 and New York City Department Of Finance
Case Number: 1:2020cv05828
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 37 Townhouse Lender LLC served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service was accepted by Debra Goldwasser, wife of reg. agent. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
September 11, 2020 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John Doe #1 through John Doe #12 served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. Service was accepted by JANE DERDERDIAN, tenant. Document filed by Harel FF, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - John Doe #2, #2 Affidavit of Service - John Doe #3).(Feuerstein, Jerold)
September 11, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York State Department of Taxation and Finance served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. Service was accepted by Heidi Kelly, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City Environmental Control Board served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. Service was accepted by Betty Mazcyk, Clerk. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City Department Of Finance served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Clerk. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Haroutiun Derderian served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. Service was accepted by "JANE" Derderian (Refused first name). Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
September 11, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amadeus 140 LLC served on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. Service was accepted by NANCY DOUGHERTY, authorized agent for secretary of state. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
September 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arnold Mitchell Greene on behalf of Amadeus 140 LLC, Haroutiun Derderian..(Greene, Arnold Mitchell)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on STIPULATION. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Although it is not within the parties' power to stipulate to an extended deadline for responding to Plaintiff's Complaint, the Court will construe the proposed stipulation as an application to extend Defendants Amadeus 140 LLC's and Haroutian Derderian's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond. Those Defendants have until October 9, 2020, to do so. Motions terminated: #21 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint,, . filed by Amadeus 140 LLC, Haroutiun Derderian., Amadeus 140 LLC answer due 10/9/2020; Haroutiun Derderian answer due 10/9/2020. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/9/2020) (cf)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint,, . Document filed by Amadeus 140 LLC, Haroutiun Derderian..(Menasche, Nicholas)
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Maurice Menasche on behalf of Amadeus 140 LLC, Haroutiun Derderian..(Menasche, Nicholas)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/18/2020) (ks)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Doe #1 through John Doe #12..(dnh)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Department of Taxation and Finance..(dnh)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Finance..(dnh)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Environmental Control Board..(dnh)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 37 Townhouse Lender LLC..(dnh)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Haroutiun Derderian..(dnh)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amadeus 140 LLC..(dnh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to "John Doe #1" through "John Doe #12", re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Finance, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Environmental Control Board, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 37 Townhouse Lender LLC, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HAROUTIUN DERDERIAN, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMADEUS 140 LLC, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Harel FF, LP..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Feuerstein, Jerold)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against 37 Townhouse Lender LLC, Amadeus 140 LLC, Haroutiun Derderian, John Doe #1 through John Doe #12, New York City Department Of Finance, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20906679)Document filed by Harel FF, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Guaranty, #5 Exhibit E - Loan Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Acceleration Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Subordinate Mortgage, #8 Exhibit H - Townhouse UCC-1, #9 Exhibit I - ECB Liens).(Feuerstein, Jerold)
July 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jerold C. Feuerstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 37 Townhouse Lender LLC, Amadeus 140 LLC, Harel FF, LP, John Doe #1 through John Doe #12, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (pne)
July 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jerold C. Feuerstein to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was filed as an attachment to another document; the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the signed PDF. (pne)
July 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jerold C. Feuerstein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
July 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR-COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20868839)Document filed by HAREL FF, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Guaranty, #5 Exhibit E - Loan Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Acceleration Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Subordinate Mortgage, #8 Exhibit H - Townhouse UCC-1, #9 Exhibit I - ECB Liens, #10 Supplement Statement pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1, #11 Civil Cover Sheet).(Feuerstein, Jerold) Modified on 7/28/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harel FF, LP v. Amadeus 140 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haroutiun Derderian
Represented By: Arnold Mitchell Greene
Represented By: Nicholas Maurice Menasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 37 TOWNHOUSE LENDER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Derderian
Represented By: Arnold Mitchell Greene
Represented By: Nicholas Maurice Menasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Finance;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMADEUS 140 LLC
Represented By: Arnold Mitchell Greene
Represented By: Nicholas Maurice Menasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Environmental Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1 through John Doe #12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAREL FF, LP
Represented By: Jerold C. Feuerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?