Bidwell v. Educators Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Kirah Bidwell
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Stark Collection Agency, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion, LLC and Educators Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2020cv05908
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application Granted. So Ordered. Stark Collection Agency, Inc. answer due 10/2/2020. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/21/2020) (js)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard J. Perr dated 09/18/2020. Document filed by Stark Collection Agency, Inc...(Perr, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Karpoff, Rachel)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement as to Educators Credit Union Only. Document filed by Kirah Bidwell..(Elsayed, Adham)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard J. Perr dated August 25, 2020. Document filed by Stark Collection Agency, Inc...(Perr, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adham Mohamed Elsayed on behalf of Kirah Bidwell..(Elsayed, Adham)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
August 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 9/10/2020. (ks)
August 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 9/10/2020. (ks)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/6/2020) (ks)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Rachel C. Karpoff dated August 4, 2020. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Karpoff, Rachel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Karpoff, Rachel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel C Karpoff on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Karpoff, Rachel)
July 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nicodemus, Camille)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 154150/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20909826).Document filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #2 Exhibit B-Amended Verified Complaint To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit C-Notice Of Electronic Filing).(Nicodemus, Camille)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bidwell v. Educators Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel C Karpoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stark Collection Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Jay Perr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educators Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirah Bidwell
Represented By: Adham Mohamed Elsayed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?