Guglielmo v. The Level Group USA Corp.
Plaintiff: Joseph Guglielmo
Defendant: The Level Group USA Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05920
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Level Group USA Corp. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren. Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo..(Force, David)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at October 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time, as further set forth. (Telephone Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/26/2020) (mml)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Level Group USA Corp...(pne)
July 31, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 31, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 31, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Level Group USA Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo..(Force, David)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Force, David)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Level Group USA Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20921590)Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo..(Force, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guglielmo v. The Level Group USA Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Guglielmo
Represented By: David Paul Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Level Group USA Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?