Caro Capital, LLC et al v. Koch et al
Plaintiff: Caro Capital, LLC, Jupiter Wellness, Inc., Richard Miller, Caro Partners, LLC and Brian John
Defendant: Bedford Investment Partners, LLC, Kaizen Advisors LLC, Robert Koch and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv06153
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Caro Capital, LLC, Caro Partners, LLC, Brian John, Jupiter Wellness, Inc., Richard Miller..(Parks, Kari)
September 23, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for September 28, 2020 is RESCHEDULED to October 8, 2020 at 3:00PM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kari Parks dated September 22, 2020. Document filed by Caro Capital, LLC, Caro Partners, LLC, Brian John, Jupiter Wellness, Inc., Richard Miller..(Parks, Kari)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #13 Counterclaim. Document filed by Caro Capital, LLC, Caro Partners, LLC, Brian John, Richard Miller..(Parks, Kari)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Caro Capital, LLC, Caro Partners, LLC..(Parks, Kari)
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Bedford Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Tennessee, #3 Certificate of Good Standing North Carolina, #4 Certificate of Good Standing Georgia, #5 Order of Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Ficken, Allison)
September 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #17 MOTION for Allison S.H. Ficken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21590958. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF TENNESSEE;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Allison S.H. Ficken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21590958. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bedford Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Allison S.H. Ficken, #2 Certificate of Good Standing GA, #3 Certificate of Good Standing Tennessee, #4 Certificate of Good Standing North Carolina, #5 Order for Admisson Pro Hac Vice).(Ficken, Allison) Modified on 9/10/2020 (vba).
September 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Christopher J. Moyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21590682. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Christopher J. Moyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21590682. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bedford Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Christopher Moyen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing GA, #3 Certificate of Good Standing IL, #4 Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Moyen, Christopher)
August 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #15 MOTION for Christopher J. Moyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21412081. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from ILLINOIS - 217-782-2035. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christopher J. Moyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21412081. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Koch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Christopher Moyen, #2 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing Georgia, #4 Certificate of Good Standing Illinois).(Moyen, Christopher) Modified on 8/31/2020 (aea).
August 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Edward Joseph Dovin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21411946. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Edward Joseph Dovin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21411946. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Koch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Edward J. Dovin, #2 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing).(Dovin, Edward)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Caro Capital, LLC, Caro Partners, LLC, Brian John, Richard Miller. Document filed by Robert Koch, Bedford Investment Partners, LLC..(Smith, Frank)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bedford Investment Partners, LLC..(Smith, Frank)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Martin Smith on behalf of Bedford Investment Partners, LLC, Robert Koch..(Smith, Frank)
August 10, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (va)
August 10, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (va)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on September 28, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/10/2020) (va)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kaizen Advisors LLC. (sj)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bedford Investment Partners, LLC. (sj)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Koch. (sj)
August 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Martin H. Kaplan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000 the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (sj)
August 7, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents John Does 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Jupiter Wellness, Inc., Caro Partners, LLC, Caro Capital, LLC, Brian John, Richard Miller. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Parks, Kari)
August 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Martin H. Kaplan re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; John Does 1-10 must be added. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin H. Kaplan on behalf of Caro Capital, LLC, Caro Partners, LLC, Brian John, Jupiter Wellness, Inc., Richard Miller..(Kaplan, Martin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Parks, Kari)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kaizen Advisors LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Caro Capital, LLC, Caro Partners, LLC, Brian John, Jupiter Wellness, Inc., Richard Miller..(Parks, Kari)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bedford Investment Partners, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Caro Capital, LLC, Caro Partners, LLC, Brian John, Jupiter Wellness, Inc., Richard Miller..(Parks, Kari)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Koch, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Caro Capital, LLC, Caro Partners, LLC, Brian John, Jupiter Wellness, Inc., Richard Miller..(Parks, Kari)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bedford Investment Partners, LLC, Kaizen Advisors LLC, Robert Koch. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21031043)Document filed by Jupiter Wellness, Inc., Caro Partners, LLC, Caro Capital, LLC, Brian John, Richard Miller..(Parks, Kari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caro Capital, LLC et al v. Koch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedford Investment Partners, LLC
Represented By: Frank Martin Smith
Represented By: Christopher Moyen
Represented By: Allison S. H. Ficken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaizen Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Koch
Represented By: Frank Martin Smith
Represented By: Christopher Moyen
Represented By: Edward J Dovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caro Capital, LLC
Represented By: Martin H. Kaplan
Represented By: Kari Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jupiter Wellness, Inc.
Represented By: Martin H. Kaplan
Represented By: Kari Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Miller
Represented By: Martin H. Kaplan
Represented By: Kari Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caro Partners, LLC
Represented By: Martin H. Kaplan
Represented By: Kari Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian John
Represented By: Martin H. Kaplan
Represented By: Kari Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?