Moran v. Trans States Airlines, LLC
Plaintiff: Donald Moran
Defendant: Trans States Airlines, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv06155
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1446pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a telephonic oral argument on October 13, 2020at11:00 a.m., which conference will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749. Access code: 7518680. To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in ( other than counsel) to mute their telephones. Additionally, all participants are directed to call in 5 minutes prior to the start of the conference. Finally, no later than October 9, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. (Telephone Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2020) (rro)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation. Document filed by Trans States Airlines, LLC..(Nwanna, Beverly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Donald Moran..(Zeitzoff, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Beverly I. Nwanna in Opposition re: #5 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Trans States Airlines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Annex/Unpub Cases, #4 Affidavit of Service).(Nwanna, Beverly)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Donald Moran. Return Date set for 9/15/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of David A. Zeitzoff, Esq., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- May 2020 Trans States Entity Information, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2- July 2020 Trans State Entity Information, #4 Affidavit Exhibit 3- Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4- USPS Confirmation, #6 Supplement Memorandum of Law).(Zeitzoff, David)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of Donald Moran..(Zeitzoff, David)
August 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Beverly Nwanna. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $280,690,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $281,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Trans States Holdings, Inc. for Trans States Airlines, LLC. Document filed by Trans States Airlines, LLC..(Nwanna, Beverly)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nwanna, Beverly)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Queens. Case Number: 705652/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21031518).Document filed by Trans States Airlines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - NYSC Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Demand Letter).(Nwanna, Beverly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran v. Trans States Airlines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Moran
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans States Airlines, LLC
Represented By: Beverly Nwanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?