United States of America v. $38,406,717.42 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $38,406,717.42 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2020cv06173
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 12, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 12, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-cv-00071-PGG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jacob M. Bergman dated August 11, 2020 re: Respectfully Requesting That This Matter Be Marked As Related to 11-0071. Document filed by United States of America..(Bergman, Jacob)
August 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bergman, Jacob)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $38,406,717.42 in United States Currency.Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Bergman, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $38,406,717.42 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $38,406,717.42 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jacob Max Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?