Antetokounmpo v. O'Rourke
Plaintiff: Giannis Antetokounmpo
Defendant: Paul Joseph O'Rourke
Case Number: 1:2020cv06218
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Paul Joseph O'Rourke served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. Service was accepted by P.J. Co-worker. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Pre Trial Conference dated 8/20/2020 and Honorable Analisa Torres Individual Rules served on Paul Joseph O'Rourke on 8/20/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at eve1y available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/20/2020) (jca)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by October 12, 2020, email a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscomis.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by October 12, 2020 advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/20/20) (yv)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 10:40 a.m., on October 19, 2020, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal Trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/20/2020) (jca)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Joseph O'Rourke..(jgo)
August 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anastasi Pardalis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Joseph O'Rourke, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Joseph O'Rourke. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21049656)Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Pardalis, Anastasi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antetokounmpo v. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giannis Antetokounmpo
Represented By: Anastasi Pardalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Joseph O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?