Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan v. Abbvie, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund and Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Abbvie, Inc. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Applicant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Case Number: 1:2020cv06223
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
September 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
September 23, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05338-LGS-BCM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mayor and City Council of Baltimore dated Sept. 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment of Cohen Milstein as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Proposed End-Payor Class. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Robertson, Sharon)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Dena C. Sharp dated September 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume).(Sharp, Christina)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Frank R. Schirripa dated September 9, 2020 re: in Support of Application to Appoint Sharon Robertson of Cohen Milstein and Robin van der Meulen of Labaton as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Proposed End-Payor Class. Document filed by Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 HRSC Firm Bio).(Pavsner, Seth)
September 2, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rjm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time until October 22, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from J. Mark Gidley dated August 14, 2020. Document filed by Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC. Document filed by Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Mark Gidley on behalf of Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn A Hettler on behalf of Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan..(Hettler, Kathryn)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(pc)
August 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20cv5538. (pc)
August 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
August 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frank Rocco Schirripa. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abbvie, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd. and Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan..(Schirripa, Frank)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-CV-5538. Document filed by Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan..(Schirripa, Frank)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan..(Schirripa, Frank)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schirripa, Frank)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21051369)Document filed by Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan..(Schirripa, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan v. Abbvie, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local No. 1150 Prescription Drug Benefit Plan
Represented By: Frank Rocco Schirripa
Represented By: Kathryn A Hettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Applicant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?