Antetokounmpo v. Paleo Productions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Giannis Antetokounmpo
Defendant: Paleo Productions LLC and Nick Massie
Case Number: 1:2020cv06224
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of A copy of the Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause together with the supporting documents served on PALEO PRODUCTIONS LLC on 10/01/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, Upon the Affirmation of Anastasi Pardalis, Esq. (ECF No. 13) and upon consideration of Plaintiff's request for Entry of Final Judgment by Default and the Certificate of Default entered by the Clerk, it is hereby:ORDERED, the Defendant PALEO PRODUCTIONS LLC shall respond in writing to this Order to Show Cause for a default judgment by 10/16/20. If the Defendant PALEO PRODUCTIONS LLC fails to respond by that date, judgment may be entered against him in the absence of a trial.ORDERED, the Plaintiff may reply by 10/21/20. The Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order to Show Cause together with the supporting documents by 10/12/20 and shall file proof of service by 10/9/20. So Ordered., ( Replies due by 10/21/2020.)( Show Cause Response due by 10/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/30/20) (yv)
September 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. #14 Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
September 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #11 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(1). Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anastasi Pardalis to RE-FILE Document #12 Proposed Default Judgment. ERROR(S): Prejudgment interest must have a % Percentage Rate, and the day that it starts from. (See sample on Court's Website, under forms for language and correct format). (dt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Anastasi Pardalis . Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Pardalis, Anastasi)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(1). Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo.(Pardalis, Anastasi) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 9/28/2020 (dt).
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to PALEO PRODUCTIONS LLC.(km)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIRMATION of Anastasi Pardalis re: #8 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default . Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Paleo Productions LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by HEATHER CAMPOLIETI. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nick Massie, Paleo Productions LLC..(pc)
August 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paleo Productions LLC and Nick Massie, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pardalis, Anastasi)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nick Massie, Paleo Productions LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21051457)Document filed by Giannis Antetokounmpo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Pardalis, Anastasi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antetokounmpo v. Paleo Productions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paleo Productions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giannis Antetokounmpo
Represented By: Anastasi Pardalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?