Doe v. Weinstein
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Harvey Weinstein
Case Number: 1:2020cv06240
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Harvey Weinstein. Document filed by Jane Doe. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Reed, Steven)
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Harvey Weinstein and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Jane Doe. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Reed, Steven)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: In an Opinion and Order dated September 3, 2020, the Court denied Plaintiff's motion to proceed under a pseudonym [ECF #12]. However, to date, Plaintiff has not filed the complaint in her own name. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file the complaint in her own name by November 16, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint by November 30, 2020. The parties are on notice that failure to comply with court orders may result in sanctions, including monetary sanctions, preclusion of claims and defense, and dismissal. ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 11/13/2020) (mro)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/28/2020 re: Letter requesting order directing Plaintiff to refile her complaint under her true identity. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Katarzyna Brozynski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Bartholomew Philip Dalton to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Katarzyna Brozynski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Brozynski, Katarzyna)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Bartholomew Philip Dalton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Dalton, Bartholomew)
September 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Bartholomew Philip Dalton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Katarzyna Brozynski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION & ORDER DENYING MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER A PSEUDONYM: For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's motion to proceed under a pseudonym is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/03/2020) (ama)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #6 MOTION Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym . Defendant Harvey Weinstein's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Imran H. Ansari on behalf of Harvey Weinstein..(Ansari, Imran)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's application is GRANTED for an additional 14 days only, or until further order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by August 24, 2020, Plaintiff shall serve copies of the Complaint and motion on the defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by August 28, 2020, the defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's motion. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 8/21/2020) (ks)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Bartholomew Philip Dalton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21267669. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Dalton, Bartholomew) Modified on 8/21/2020 (bcu).
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Katarzyna Brozynski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21267211. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Brozynski, Katarzyna) Modified on 8/21/2020 (bcu).
August 21, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Bartholomew Philip Dalton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21267669. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #7 MOTION for Katarzyna Brozynski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21267211. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas and California. We do not accept certificates from state bar registrations from these states.; Attorney Affidavit/Declaration missing per local rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/24/2020 Service due by 8/24/2020. (ks)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym . Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Reed, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harvey Weinstein..(pne)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's application is GRANTED for 14 days or until further order of the assigned district court judge, whichever comes earlier. That is, between now and August 21, 2020, inclusive, Defendant and defense counsel may not disclose Plaintiff's identity, and all filings in this matter shall redact Plaintiff's personally identifiable information and use the Jane Doe pseudonym where applicable. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/07/2020) (ama)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harvey Weinstein, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Bouskila, Sarah)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pne)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harvey Weinstein. Document filed by Jane Doe..(pne)
August 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Steven J. Reed. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 8/12/2020..(pne)
August 7, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21055973..(Bouskila, Sarah)
August 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Weinstein
Represented By: Imran H. Ansari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Steven J. Reed
Represented By: Katarzyna Brozynski
Represented By: Bartholomew P. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?