Ramirez v. Temin & Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Ramirez
Defendant: Davia Temin and Temin & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06258
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 29 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter filed by Temin & Company, Inc., Davia Temin. ENDORSEMENT: A pre-motion conference will be held on September 30, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The conference will occur by telephone. The parties are directed to call (877) 411-9748; access code: 3029857. ( Telephone Conference set for 9/30/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/14/2020) (mro)
September 11, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E.E. Keenan dated 9/11/2020 re: Response to Dkt. 18, Defendants' Letter for Premotion Conference. Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez..(Keenan, Edward)
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E.E. Keenan dated 9/11/2020 re: Response to Dkt. 18, Defendants' Letter for Premotion Conference. Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez..(Keenan, Edward)
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E.E. Keenan dated 9/11/2020 re: Supplemental Letter Regarding Motion to Seal. Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Article from Swarthmore Phoenix).(Keenan, Edward)
September 9, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E.E. Keenan dated 9/9/2020 re: Plaintiff's Proposed Redactions. Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Turnkey Document with Plaintiff's Proposed Redactions).(Keenan, Edward)
September 8, 2020 Filing 24 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E.E. Keenan dated 9/8/2020 re: Status Update on Letter Application to Seal. Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez..(Keenan, Edward)
September 8, 2020 Filing 23 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #22 Letter filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to submit proposed redactions on consent by Tuesday, September 8, 2020 at 5:00 PM, or advise the Court at that time if they have been unable to reach an agreement. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/8/2020) (mro)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E.E. Keenan dated 9/4/2020 re: Status Update on Letter Application to Seal. Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez..(Keenan, Edward)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to #19 Letter, #6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 1-2 and redact 1 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 27, 2020. by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc., Kaitlyn RamirezMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #6 .(Nacchio, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 REDACTION to #19 Letter, #6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 1-2 and redact 1 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 27, 2020. by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc..(Nacchio, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated September 4, 2020 re: Dkt. No. 6. Document filed by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc...(Nacchio, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated September 3, 2020 re: request for a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc...(Nacchio, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez. ENDORSEMENT: The parties have not advised the Court if they met and conferred, as required, before submitting the instant letter motions. The parties are therefore directed to meet and confer and either submit proposed redactions on consent by Friday, September 4, 2020 at 5:00 PM, or advise the Court at that time if they have been unable to reach an agreement. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/1/2020) (rro)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E.E. Keenan dated 9/1/2020 re: #6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 1-2 and redact 1 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 27, 2020. . Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Temin Biography from Public Website).(Keenan, Edward)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The application is granted. Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/31/2020) (mro)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 31, 2020 re: Dkt. No. 6. Document filed by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc...(Nacchio, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Order on Motion to Seal, #6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 1-2 and redact 1 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 27, 2020. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from E.E. Keenan dated 8/31/2020. Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez..(Keenan, Edward)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER with respect to #6 Letter Motion to Seal. Plaintiff is directed to respond by Monday, August 31, 2020 at 5:00 PM. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/28/2020) (va)
August 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/31/2020. (va)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc...(Nacchio, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to #6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 1-2 and redact 1 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 27, 2020. by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc., Kaitlyn RamirezMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #6 .(Nacchio, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to #6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 1-2 and redact 1 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 27, 2020. by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc., Kaitlyn RamirezMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #6 .(Nacchio, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 REDACTION to #6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 1-2 and redact 1 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 27, 2020. Redacted Complaint by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc..(Nacchio, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 REDACTION to #6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 1-2 and redact 1 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 27, 2020. Redacted Turnkey Document by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc..(Nacchio, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Seal Dkt. No. 1-2 and redact 1 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Nacchio dated August 27, 2020. Document filed by Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc...(Nacchio, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Nacchio on behalf of Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc...(Nacchio, Michael)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc.. (sj)
August 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward Emmett Keenan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
August 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Temin & Company, Inc., and Davia Temin, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez..(Keenan, Edward)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Keenan, Edward)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Davia Temin, Temin & Company, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21060343)Document filed by Kaitlyn Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Turnkey Document).(Keenan, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Temin & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Ramirez
Represented By: Edward Emmett Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davia Temin
Represented By: Michael Nacchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temin & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Nacchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?