Gold Town Corp. v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gold Town Corp.
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc. and Kenneth Ransom
Case Number: 1:2020cv06287
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:14501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 25 FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 FIRST MOTION to Remand plaintiff's case to state courts. . Document filed by Gold Town Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-tracking detail 2, #2 Exhibit C- delivery of am item under another tracking number, #3 Exhibit D- tracking detail "returning" item, #4 Exhibit A- tracking detail 1).(Rubin, Diana)
September 14, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of September 11, 2020 Order served on Kenneth Ransom on September 11, 2020. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc...(Rappoport, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: In light of these two pending motions, either of which could terminate the litigation before this Court, the Court adjourns the Initial Pretrial Conference, currently scheduled for September 25, 2020, sine die. The Court will set a new date and time for an initial pretrial conference if this litigation survives both the motion to remand and the motion to dismiss. Defendant UPS is directed to serve a copy of this Order on defendant Ransom forthwith, and file an affidavit of service on the docket by close of business on Monday, September 14, 2020. SO ORDERED. ***Hearings Terminated*** The following hearing(s) was terminated: Initial Conference. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/11/2020) (jca)
September 10, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of UPS Opposition to Plaintiff Gold Towns Motion to Remand, Declaration of Steven T. Rappoport in Opposition to Plaintiff Gold Towns Motion to Remand, and Exhibits A & B to the Declaration of Steven T. Rappoport in Opposition to Plaintiff Gold Towns Motion to Remand served on Kenneth Ransom on September 10, 2020. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc...(Rappoport, Steven)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Steven T. Rappoport in Opposition re: #14 FIRST MOTION to Remand plaintiff's case to state courts.. Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Rappoport, Steven)
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #14 FIRST MOTION to Remand plaintiff's case to state courts. . Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc...(Rappoport, Steven)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Diana Rubin dated 08/27/2020 re: Response to UPS's letter dated 08/26/2020. Document filed by Gold Town Corp...(Rubin, Diana)
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Steven T. Rappoport dated August 26, 2020 re: Information Requested in August 12, 2020 Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Rappoport, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Stay: Granted. The Court hereby stays the briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss, set forth at Dkt. 10, pending the Court's resolution of plaintiff's motion to remand. The briefing schedule for the motion to remand, set out in the Court's initial scheduling order at Dkt. 4, remains in place. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/25/2020) (jwh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay defendant's motion to dismiss and other court's set dates i.e. amend complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Diana Rubin dated 08/24/2020. Document filed by Gold Town Corp.. Return Date set for 8/31/2020 at 09:30 AM..(Rubin, Diana)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 FIRST MOTION to Remand plaintiff's case to state courts. . Document filed by Gold Town Corp...(Rubin, Diana)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST MOTION to Remand plaintiff's case to state courts. Document filed by Gold Town Corp...(Rubin, Diana)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gold Town Corp...(Rubin, Diana)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diana Rubin on behalf of Gold Town Corp...(Rubin, Diana)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Certificate of Service re: #10 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,. Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc...(Rappoport, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Under Rule 15(a)(1)(B), a plaintiff has 21 days after the service of a motion under Rule 12(b) to amend the complaint once as a matter of course. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by September 8, 2020. No further opportunities to amend will ordinarily be granted. If plaintiff chooses not to file an amended complaint, plaintiff shall file an opposition to UPS's motion to dismiss by September 8, 2020. UPS's reply, if any, shall be filed by September 15, 2020. If plaintiff does amend the complaint, UPS shall thereafter have 21 days, until September 15, 2020, to: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) submit a letter to the Court, copying all parties, stating that it relies on the previously filed motion to dismiss. (As further set forth in this Order.) UPS is directed to serve a copy of this order on both plaintiff and defendant Ransom, and to file an affidavit of service on the docket by August 20, 2020. ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/8/2020., Motions due by 9/15/2020., Responses due by 9/8/2020, Replies due by 9/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/18/2020) (cf)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss served on GOLD TOWN CORP. on 08/17/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc...(Rappoport, Steven)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc...(Rappoport, Steven)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Responses due by 9/3/2020.(Rappoport, Steven)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Gold Town Corp. and Kenneth Ransom on 8/12/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc...(Rappoport, Steven)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/25/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound (#) key, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/12/2020) (jwh)
August 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for United Parcel Service, Inc.. Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc...(Rappoport, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rappoport, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court, County of New York. Case Number: 006749/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21083875).Document filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint).(Rappoport, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold Town Corp. v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Town Corp.
Represented By: Diana Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Thomas Rappoport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?