Diggs v. National Railroad Passenger Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Diggs
Defendant: David Gauld and National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06301
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Suzanne Rubenstein on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corp...(Rubenstein, Rachel)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Washington Terminal Company, Other Affiliate Canadian Pacific Railway, Other Affiliate Burlington Northern and Santa Fe LLC, Other Affiliate American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway for National Railroad Passenger Corp.. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corp...(Bonventre, John)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corp...(Bonventre, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Gauld waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. Document filed by Stephanie Diggs..(Wietzke, Marc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. National Railroad Passenger Corp. waiver sent on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Document filed by Stephanie Diggs..(Wietzke, Marc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Gauld, National Railroad Passenger Corp...(pne)
August 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corp. and David Gauld, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephanie Diggs..(Wietzke, Marc)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Gauld, National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21097526)Document filed by Stephanie Diggs..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diggs v. National Railroad Passenger Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Diggs
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gauld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Represented By: John Anthony Bonventre
Represented By: Rachel Suzanne Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?