Hirshman v. Franzen
Plaintiff: Linda Hirshman
Defendant: Don Franzen
Case Number: 1:2020cv06322
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Don Franzen in Support re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Matter.. Document filed by Don Franzen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #2 Exhibit No. 2 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #3 Exhibit No. 3 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #4 Exhibit No. 4 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #5 Exhibit No. 5 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #6 Exhibit No. 6 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #7 Exhibit No. 7 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #8 Exhibit No. 8 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #9 Exhibit No. 9 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #10 Exhibit No. 10 to the Declaration of Don Franzen, #11 Exhibit No. 11 to the Declaration of Don Franzen).(Greenberger, David)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Matter. . Document filed by Don Franzen..(Greenberger, David)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Matter. Document filed by Don Franzen..(Greenberger, David)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Defendant's September 8, 2020 request for leave to file motion to compel arbitration, Dkt. No. 10, is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file and serve his motion to compel arbitration is October 9, 2020. Plaintiff's opposition is due within twenty-one days after service of Defendant's motion; Defendant's reply, if any, is due within seven days after service of Plaintiffs opposition. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to fourteen days after the Court's decision on the motion to compel arbitration. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 15, 2020 is adjourned sine die., Motions due by 10/9/2020. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/15/2020) (rj)
September 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2020. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch) (Daniels, Anthony)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gabriel Levinson dated September 11, 2020 re: Letter in Response to Defendant's Prior Letter (Docket #10). Document filed by Linda Hirshman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D. Greenberger email, #2 Exhibit Sisters Project Assignment Agreement).(Levinson, Gabriel)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Counsel for the Parties dated September 10, 2020 re: Request for Consent to Conduct All Further Proceedings Before the Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Linda Hirshman..(Stanislaus, Darnell)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter, filed by Don Franzen. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a conference call regarding Defendant's proposed motion on September 14, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to use the conference call dial-in information and access code noted in the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19 available on the Court's website, and are specifically directed to comply with Emergency Rule 2(C). (Telephone Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/9/2020) (rro)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shashi Keshab Dholandas on behalf of Don Franzen..(Dholandas, Shashi)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from David I. Greenberger dated September 8, 2020 re: Defendant's intention to file a Motion to Compel arbitration and request for an extension of his time to answer, respond or otherwise move to allow for the same. Document filed by Don Franzen..(Greenberger, David)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date of this order file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order (and also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf). The executed form should be filed on ECF as a "Proposed Order," and be described using the "Consent Order" filing event in accordance with ECF Rule 13.18. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks of the date of this order advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/27/2020) (ks)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Ian Greenberger on behalf of Don Franzen..(Greenberger, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Don Franzen served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Document filed by Linda Hirshman..(Stanislaus, Darnell)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/13/2020) (mro)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Don Franzen..(pc)
August 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabriel Levinson on behalf of Linda Hirshman..(Levinson, Gabriel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Don Franzen, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Linda Hirshman..(Stanislaus, Darnell)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stanislaus, Darnell)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Don Franzen. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21105572)Document filed by Linda Hirshman..(Stanislaus, Darnell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirshman v. Franzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hirshman
Represented By: Darnell Stybel Stanislaus
Represented By: Gabriel Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Franzen
Represented By: David Ian Greenberger
Represented By: Shashi Keshab Dholandas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?