Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. Torrent Pharma, Inc.
Plaintiff: Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Defendant: Torrent Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06345
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 39 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Torrent Pharma, Inc.. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/5/2020).(jwh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 38 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Torrent Pharma, Inc..Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L).(Arezina, Vladimir)
October 2, 2020 NOTICE: The TIME for the initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 14, 2020 is moved to 5:15 p.m. The conference will proceed telephonically. The call-in information for this teleconference is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749, Access Code: 3667981. (Nacanther, Florence)
September 30, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Consent to Referral to Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Arezina, Vladimir)
September 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Rabea Jamal Zayed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 25, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Rabea Jamal Zayed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21842387. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Torrent Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Rabea Jamal Zayed, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - IL, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - MN, #4 Proposed Order).(Zayed, Rj)
September 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Rabea Jamal Zayed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21842387. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 18, 2020 Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #33 Letter, filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Echo may amend its pleadings within 14 days. Defendant's pre-motion letter request is denied without prejudice to renewal against any amended pleading. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/18/2020) (rro)
September 16, 2020 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Vladimir I. Arezina dated September 16, 2020 re: Echo Bay's Response to Torrent's Pre-Motion Letter Seeking Permission to file Motions to Dismiss and Stay Discovery (ECF 27, 28 and 32). Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Arezina, Vladimir)
September 16, 2020 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ben D. Kappelman dated September 14, 2020 re: permission to file motions to dismiss and stay discovery (unsealed by Courts Order at ECF 31). Document filed by Torrent Pharma, Inc...(Kappelman, Ben)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Seal; denying #26 Letter Motion to Seal: Motion (Doc 7) to seal Exhibits A and B to the Complaint is DENIED. Letter motion (Doc 26) to seal unredacted version of promotion letter is DENIED. Echo Bay shall promptly file Exhibits A and B to the Complaint and its unredacted letter of September 14, 2020. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/15/2020) (jwh)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Donna Reuter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 15, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Donna Reuter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21667055. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Torrent Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Donna Reuter, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Reuter, Donna)
September 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Donna Reuter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21667055. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 14, 2020 Filing 28 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ben D. Kappelman dated Sept. 14, 2020 re: permission to file motions to dismiss and stay discovery SEALED. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Torrent Pharma, Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #26 .(Kappelman, Ben)
September 14, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ben D. Kappelman dated Sept. 14, 2020 re: permission to file motions to dismiss and stay discovery REDACTED. Document filed by Torrent Pharma, Inc...(Kappelman, Ben)
September 14, 2020 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION to Seal Unredacted Version of Letter Seeking Permission to File Motions to Dismiss and to Stay addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ben D. Kappelman dated Sept. 14, 2020. Document filed by Torrent Pharma, Inc...(Kappelman, Ben)
September 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Ostojic on behalf of Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Ostojic, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Arezina on behalf of Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Arezina, Alexander)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/2/2020) (jwh)
September 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Torrent Pharma, Inc. answer due 9/14/2020. (jwh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ben D. Kappelman dated September 1, 2020. Document filed by Torrent Pharma, Inc...(Kappelman, Ben)
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Complaint. . Document filed by Torrent Pharma, Inc...(Kappelman, Ben)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. for Torrent Pharma, Inc.. Document filed by Torrent Pharma, Inc...(Kappelman, Ben)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ben Kappelman on behalf of Torrent Pharma, Inc...(Kappelman, Ben)
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vladimir Arezina on behalf of Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Alexander I. Arezina to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Jovan R. Ostojic to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Jovan R. Ostojic to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21299865. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Alexander I. Arezina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21299355. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Alexander I. Arezina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21299355. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 24, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Jovan R. Ostojic to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21299865. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/19/2020) (kv)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Torrent Pharma, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service was accepted by Doreen Haeselin, Litigation Management Representative. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Vladimir I. Arezina to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 AMENDED MOTION for Vladimir I. Arezina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION for Vladimir I. Arezina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Torrent Pharma, Inc...(jgo)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Complaint. . Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Torrent Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #7 .(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Complaint. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Torrent Pharma, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Vladimir Arezina to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Vladimir I. Arezina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21120779. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Arezina, Vladimir) Modified on 8/12/2020 (vba).
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Torrent Pharma, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Arezina, Vladimir) Modified on 8/13/2020 (pc).
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC..(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Torrent Pharma, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21119482)Document filed by Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J).(Arezina, Vladimir)
August 12, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #5 MOTION for Vladimir I. Arezina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21120779. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF ILLINOIS;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. Torrent Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Echo Bay Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Vladimir Arezina
Represented By: Alexander Arezina
Represented By: John Ostojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Reuter
Represented By: Rj Zayed
Represented By: Ben Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?