Simpson v. Keyser
Petitioner: Theodore Simpson
Respondent: William F. Keyser
Case Number: 1:2020cv06408
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Mailed a copy of #7 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Theodore Simpson, DIN 96-A-3862, Sullivan Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 116, Fallsburg, NY 12733-0116. (dsh)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. The Court construes Petitioner's claims as seeking habeas corpus relief under 28 U.S.C. 2254. The Court directs Petitioner to show cause, within 60 days of the date of this order, why his claims challenging the imposition of his Bronx County sentences should not be transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit as second or successive. The Court also grants Petitioner 60 days to submit written notification to the Court of his withdrawal of his remaining claims for 2254 habeas corpus relief. The Court further grants Petitioner 60 days' leave to submit an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 2254 containing the information specified above. If Petitioner files an amended petition, the Court will understand that filing as Petitioner's consent to proceed with his claims for relief under 2254. Petitioner may list, in his amended petition, his reasons why his claims challenging the imposition of his Bronx County sentences should not be transferred to the Second Circuit. The amended petition must be submitted to the Court's Pro Se Intake Unit, be captioned as an "Amended Petition," and bear the same docket number as this order. An Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 form is attached to this order, which Petitioner should complete as specified above. Petitioner is advised that if he files an amended petition, it will completely replace his original pleading. If Petitioner fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the Court will deny Petitioner's claims for habeas corpus relief without prejudice. Because Petitioner has not at this time made a substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/4/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
October 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
September 28, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order Granting IFP Application to Theodore Simpson, DIN 96-A-3862, Sullivan Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 116, Fallsburg, NY 12733-0116. (dsh)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/28/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Theodore Simpson.(sc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Theodore Simpson.(sc)
August 19, 2020 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, and an IFP application, to Theodore Simpson, DIN # 96-A-3862 at Sullivan Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 116, Fallsburg, NY 12733-0116. (kh)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Petitioner is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 9/17/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/17/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on August 18, 2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP application) (jjg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
August 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION. Document filed by Theodore Simpson..(rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #1 Appendix) (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Keyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Theodore Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William F. Keyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?