DeSimone et al v. TIAA Bank, FSB
Plaintiff: Mohammad Hussain, Patrick Gardner, Nicholas DeSimone and Paul Malstrom
Defendant: TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06492
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TIAA, FSB Holding, Inc. for TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp.. Document filed by TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp...(Sheehan, Barbara)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of of Filing Consent(s) to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Consents of Erika Brown, Patrick Daniels, Mary Elrod, and Jeffrey Teplitz).(Soloff, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Justin Lee Swidler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22027586. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin L. Swidler. Esq/, #2 PA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Swidler, Justin)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consents to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom..(Soloff, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #45 MOTION for Justin Lee Swidler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22027586. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of of Filing Consent(s) to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Consents of David Capek, Jeffrey Krueger, Roy Muro, Ruth Principe, and David Smith).(Soloff, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. On October 2, 2020, the Court received a voicemail from counsel. Per Rule 1.A of the Undersigned's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, all communications with the Court shall be by letter filed on ECF unless there is a redaction or sealing request. The Court will ignore all communication in violation of Rule 1.A, including the October 2, 2020 voicemail. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/4/2020) (rjm)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of of Filing Consent(s) to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Consents of Michael Benedetto and Richard Diaz).(Soloff, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Lesser Complaint)).(Sheehan, Barbara)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp.. Responses due by 10/13/2020.(Sheehan, Barbara)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp...(Sheehan, Barbara)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of of Filing Consent(s) to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Consents of Jennifer Gattie, Terrence Jones, Richard Montoya and Barbara Myers).(Soloff, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Renee G. Culotta, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21847623. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renee G. Culotta, Esq., #2 Certificate of Good Standing of Renee G. Culotta, Esq., #3 Proposed - Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Sheehan, Barbara)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leslie W. Ehret, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21847374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie W. Ehret, Esq., #2 Certificate of Good Standing of Leslie W. Ehret, Esq., #3 Proposed - Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Sheehan, Barbara)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Benjamin M. Castoriano, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21846757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin M. Castoriano, Esq., #2 Certificate of Good Standing of Benjamin M. Castoriano, Esq., #3 Proposed - Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Sheehan, Barbara)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 MOTION for Renee G. Culotta, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21847623. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #34 MOTION for Benjamin M. Castoriano, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21846757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #35 MOTION for Leslie W. Ehret, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21847374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of of Filing Consent(s) to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Consents of Alexander Barcza, Anthony Fabiani and April Ramker).(Soloff, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of of Filing Consent(s) to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Consents of Peter Asadoorian, Jason Farina, Paul Hart, Jr., and Andrew Wachter).(Soloff, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of of Filing Consent(s) to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Consents of John Astrologo, Robert DiRusso, Cheryl Freeman and Michael Secor).(Soloff, Robert)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of of Filing Consent(s) to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Consents of Stephen Gallagher, Stephen Karl, and Trevor Schmetterer).(Soloff, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of of Filing Consent(s) to Join Lawsuit. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Consents of Aaron Pearlman and Max Reber).(Soloff, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/10/2020) (cf)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/3/2020) (kv)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp. answer due 9/29/2020. (kv)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michelle Hayes and Bradley Martin Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Robert David Soloff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cammie Brodie, Pradeep Madaan, and Joseph McGreevy Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Marc Alan Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judy Campbell-Wallace, Mauricio Carrasco, Michael J. Lynch, David Nagel, Kurt Olson, and Zachary Rose Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Barbara A. Sheehan dated September 2, 2020. Document filed by TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp...(Sheehan, Barbara)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barbara A Sheehan on behalf of TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp...(Sheehan, Barbara)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jennifer Bell, Sandeep Gill, Gary Haynes, Jennifer Johnson, Patrick McCalley, David Townsley, and James Wentzel Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Drew Dapkus, Jason Howell, Tristen Hunt, Daniel James, Elizabeth Lauziere, Craig Paladeau, Tyler Weir, and Kenneth Williamson Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Marc Alan Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Silverman, Marc)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Marc Alan Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21407492. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Silverman, Marc) Modified on 8/31/2020 (wb).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-01707-AJN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Robert David Soloff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21384970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Marc Alan Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #16 MOTION for Marc Alan Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21407492. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cory Benner, David Cullinane, Elizabeth Lesniewski, Jerry McClain, Michelle Sheehan, and Olivia Yun-Kearns Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Robert David Soloff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21384970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit - Fla Supreme Court Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Soloff, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michael J. Hoyt, Peter Pham, Michael Schmid, Fara Tabrizi, and James Taggart Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jennifer McGetrick, James Dorcely, Tanis Anderson, Edward St. John, Rainy Holzworth, Priscilla DeMasi, Nicole Crabtree, Lisa Angarano, Marlise Sa, Michael Proffitt, and Brian Mun.).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michael Hendrickson, Tracy Mertes, William Milne, Jill Moore, Elizabeth Nudo, Bradley Pace, Jeromy Peters, Robert Smith, and Amy Stout Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michael Gindling, Jerrod Harlan, Marc LaRoche, Cynthia Small, and Danielle Tirado Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gregory Knox, Bruce Schwalb, Jonathan Oh, James Chu, and Brian Biancardi Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michael Bellotte, Doron Eisenberg, Richard Eul, Jason Geary, Thomas Gilson, Brian Goodman, Scott Gordon, Raymond Hrabec, Donnelly Kinne, Sean Lee, Joseph Nelson, Sophia Ngo, Thi Nguyen, Andy Tran, Tuan Tran, Virgina Tyree, Lianxia Wang, and Kelley Yee Consent Forms).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form Carrie, #2 Exhibit Consent form Dexter, #3 Exhibit Consent form Godden, #4 Exhibit Consent form McKenzie, #5 Exhibit Consent form Oledzki, #6 Exhibit Consent form Palacios, #7 Exhibit Consent form Taormina, #8 Exhibit Consent form Verdicchio).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-01707. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom..(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp...(pc)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Carly Jane Skarbnik. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Paul Malstrom, Nicholas DeSimone, Mohammad Hussain, Patrick Gardner. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Carly Jane Skarbnik, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alison J. Nathan as possibly related to 19cv1707. (pc)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom..(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Nicholas DeSimone, Patrick Gardner, Mohammad Hussain, Paul Malstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join Lawsuit).(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Skarbnik, Carly)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21163993)Document filed by Paul Malstrom, Nicholas DeSimone, Mohammad Hussain, Patrick Gardner..(Skarbnik, Carly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeSimone et al v. TIAA Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Hussain
Represented By: Carly Jane Skarbnik
Represented By: Marc Silverman
Represented By: Robert D. Soloff
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Gardner
Represented By: Carly Jane Skarbnik
Represented By: Marc Silverman
Represented By: Robert D. Soloff
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas DeSimone
Represented By: Carly Jane Skarbnik
Represented By: Marc Silverman
Represented By: Robert D. Soloff
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Malstrom
Represented By: Carly Jane Skarbnik
Represented By: Marc Silverman
Represented By: Robert D. Soloff
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIAA Bank, FSB, f/k/a Everbank Financial Corp.
Represented By: Barbara A Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?