Russell et al v. Klein et al
Plaintiff: Heidi Russell and Valentina Bajada
Defendant: Katherine Klein, Lawrence Marks and Kate Gladstone
Case Number: 1:2020cv06503
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Plaintiffs, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, voluntarily dismiss their complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/26/2020) (va)
August 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 41. (km)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Katherine Klein, Lawrence Marks. Document filed by Heidi Russell, Valentina Bajada. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Schwartz, Arthur)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The hearing scheduled for 4:00PM today has been CANCELLED based on Plaintiff's representation to the Court (via email to Chambers) that they are withdrawing their application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Arthur Z. Schwartz).(Schwartz, Arthur)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Plaintiffs counsel has yet to file any motion for TRO on the public docket and has not asked that the motion be sealed. If Plaintiffs motion does not appear on the public docket by 3:00 p.m. today, the Court will cancel the conference scheduled for 4:00 p.m. and will deny the motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (MM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Elizabeth A. Forman dated 8/21/20 re: Letter Response to TRO. Document filed by Lawrence Marks..(Forman, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Telephone Conference held on 8/20/2020 in re: Plaintiff's Application for a TRO. Arthur Schwartz present by telephone for Plaintiffs. Defendant, Katherine Klein, present by telephone. Elizabeth Forman present by telephone for Defendant, Chief Administrative Judge Lawrence Marks and on behalf of NY State Unified Court System. Court reporter present by telephone. (mf)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: As discussed at the hearing held today, Defendant Marks shall file papers responsive to Plaintiffs' TRO application no later than 1:00 p.m. tomorrow. Defendant Klein is invited to do so by the same deadline. The parties shall appear for a continued TRO hearing at 4:00 p.m. tomorrow. They are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use access code 2123101. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/21/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/20/2020) (va)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Plaintiffs counsel applied to the Court via email for an order directing Defendants Housing Court counsel to contact Plaintiff via telephone and alert her to todays hearing. Plaintiffs counsel has also stated that he would inform Defendant of todays hearing via email. Plaintiffs counsels application is denied. Plaintiffs counsel may inform Defendant of todays hearing by email. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (MM)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties shall appear for a Telephone Conference on Plaintiff's Application for a TRO, today, August 20, 2020 at 2:00PM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. (Telephone Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Anne Forman on behalf of Lawrence Marks..(Forman, Elizabeth)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Katherine Klein, Lawrence Marks. Document filed by Heidi Russell, Valentina Bajada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Housing Court Holdover Action, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Housing Court Settlement and Judgment, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Exec Order 202.8, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Exec Order 202.28, #5 Exhibit EX E - Exec order 202.48, #6 Exhibit EX.F- Exec Order 202.55, #7 Exhibit EX. G - Judge Marks 8-12-20 Order, #8 Exhibit Ex.H1 -Gladstone OSC, #9 Exhibit Ex. H2 - Gladstone Lockou, #10 Exhibit Ex. I - Felony Complaint, #11 Exhibit EX. J- Felony Indictment, #12 Exhibit EX. K - Misdemeanor Complaint).(Schwartz, Arthur)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence Marks..(jgo)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Katherine Klein..(jgo)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Arthur Z Schwartz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Katherine Klein; Lawrence Marks. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Arthur Z Schwartz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Arthur Z Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lawrence Marks, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Katherine Klein a/k/a Kate Gladstone, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Heidi Russell and Valentina Bajada, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 8/18/2020 (jgo).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Katherine Klein, Lawrence Marks. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-21176670)Document filed by Heidi Russell, Valentina Bajada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Holdover Petition, #2 Exhibit Ex. B -Settlement and Judgment of Eviction, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Exec Order 202.8, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Exec. Order 202.28, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Exec. Order 202.48, #6 Exhibit Ex. F -Exec. Order 202.55, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Judge Marks' August 12, 2020 Order, #8 Exhibit Ex. H1 - Gladstone OSC, #9 Exhibit Ex. H2 - Gladstone Lockout Petition).(Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 8/18/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell et al v. Klein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Marks
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Gladstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Russell
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Bajada
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?