Komatsu v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Towaki Komatsu
Defendant: The New York State Office of Court Administration, Urban Pathways Inc., Frederick Shack, Sharon Coates, Allison Heilbraun, The New York State Unified Court System, Cubesmart, Ronald Abad, Molly McCracken, Ann Marie Scalia, Eric Tavel, The City of New York, Wendell Vaughan, Nancy Bannon, Steven Banks, Marilyn Andzeski, Brenda Spears, Avraham Schmeidler, Lisa Lombardi, Marin Gerber, Nancy Southwell, Kishea Paulemont, Kristin Benjammin-Solis, Daniels Norelli Cecere & Tavel PC and Jeffrey Mosczyc
Case Number: 1:2020cv06510
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: amending #2 Complaint, against Ronald Abad, Marilyn Andzeski, Steven Banks, Nancy Bannon, Kristin Benjammin-Solis, Sharon Coates, Cubesmart, Daniels Norelli Cecere & Tavel PC, Marin Gerber, Allison Heilbraun, Lisa Lombardi, Molly McCracken, Jeffrey Mosczyc, Kishea Paulemont, Ann Marie Scalia, Avraham Schmeidler, Frederick Shack, Nancy Southwell, Brenda Spears, Eric Tavel, The City of New York, The New York State Office of Court Administration, The New York State Unified Court System, Urban Pathways Inc., Wendell Vaughan with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Towaki Komatsu. Related document: #2 Complaint.(sc)
September 3, 2020 Mailed a copy of #7 Order to Towaki Komatsu at 802 Fairmount Pl., Apt. 4B, Bronx, NY 10460. (kh)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #5 Letter filed by Towaki Komatsu. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court denies Plaintiffs request to seal his IFP applications. (ECF 5.) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/2/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 1, 2020 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application to Towaki Komatsu at 802 Fairmount Pl., Apt. 4B, Bronx, NY 10460. (kh)
September 1, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/31/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from T. Komatsu, dated 8/31/20 re: I am filing this letter to submit the revised IFP application for that case that properly includes my signature for that application after I inadvertently forgot to properly sign the IFP application which I submitted for this case on 8/14/20 via email to your office etc. Document filed by Towaki Komatsu..(sc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 (Revised)APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Towaki Komatsu.(sc)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 PRELIMINARY STATEMENT. Document filed by Towaki Komatsu.(rdz)
August 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ronald Abad, Marilyn Andzeski, Steven Banks, Nancy Bannon, Kristin Benjammin-Solis, Sharon Coates, Cubesmart, Daniels Norelli Cecere & Tavel PC, Marin Gerber, Allison Heilbraun, Lisa Lombardi, Molly McCracken, Jeffrey Mosczyc, Kishea Paulemont, Ann Marie Scalia, Avraham Schmeidler, Frederick Shack, Nancy Southwell, Brenda Spears, Eric Tavel, The City of New York, The New York State Office of Court Administration, The New York State Unified Court System, Urban Pathways Inc., Wendell Vaughan. Document filed by Towaki Komatsu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(rdz)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Towaki Komatsu.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komatsu v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York State Office of Court Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Pathways Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Shack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Heilbraun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York State Unified Court System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cubesmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Abad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly McCracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Scalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Tavel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Andzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avraham Schmeidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Southwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kishea Paulemont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Benjammin-Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniels Norelli Cecere & Tavel PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Mosczyc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?