Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company v. Tiger Trans LLC
Plaintiff: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Tiger Trans LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv06512
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tiger Trans LLC..(pne)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TIGER TRANS LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company..(Canter, Nelson)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Canter, Nelson)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nelson E Canter. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nelson E Canter to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. Document filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company..(Canter, Nelson)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Canter, Nelson) Modified on 8/18/2020 (jgo).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tiger Trans LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21180266)Document filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company..(Canter, Nelson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company v. Tiger Trans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Trans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nelson E Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?