Building Service 32BJ Health Fund et al v. R & R Janitorial Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Building Service 32BJ Health Fund, Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund, Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund and Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund
Defendant: R & R Janitorial Inc., R & R Janitorial, Painting & Building Services, Inc. and R & R Painting & Building Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06524
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund, Building Service 32BJ Health Fund, Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund, Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund. Document filed by Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund, Building Service 32BJ Health Fund, Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund, Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Sturm, Ira)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter, filed by Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund, Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund, Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund, Building Service 32BJ Health Fund. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/8/2020) (cf)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between counsel for defendant and counsel for plaintiffs that the time for defendant to answer or otherwise plead or move in this case shall be extended from September 15, 2020 to October 15, 2020. So Ordered. R & R Janitorial Inc. answer due 10/15/2020; R & R Janitorial, Painting & Building Services, Inc. answer due 10/15/2020; R & R Painting & Building Services, Inc. answer due 10/15/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/8/2020) (js)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Mark Wexler on behalf of R & R Janitorial Inc., R & R Janitorial, Painting & Building Services, Inc., R & R Painting & Building Services, Inc...(Wexler, Howard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Ira A. Sturm dated 09/03/2020 re: Extend time to answer or otherwise move. Document filed by Building Service 32BJ Health Fund, Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund, Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund, Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Sturm, Ira)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. R & R Painting & Building Services, Inc. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service was accepted by Natalia Manjarres, Office Manager. Document filed by Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund; Building Service 32BJ Health Fund; Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund; Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund..(Sturm, Ira)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. R & R Janitorial, Painting & Building Services, Inc. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service was accepted by Natalie Manjarres, Office Manager. Document filed by Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund; Building Service 32BJ Health Fund; Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund; Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund..(Sturm, Ira)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. R & R Janitorial Inc. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service was accepted by Natalie Manjarres, Office Manager. Document filed by Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund; Building Service 32BJ Health Fund; Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund; Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund..(Sturm, Ira)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/18/2020) (cf)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to R & R Janitorial Inc., R & R Janitorial, Painting & Building Services, Inc., R & R Painting & Building Services, Inc...(pne)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to R & R Janitorial Inc., R & R Painting & Building Services, Inc. and R & R Janitorial, Painting & Building Services, Inc., re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Building Service 32BJ Health Fund, Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund, Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund, Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund..(Sturm, Ira)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against R & R Janitorial Inc., R & R Janitorial, Painting & Building Services, Inc., R & R Painting & Building Services, Inc.. Document filed by Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund, Building Service 32BJ Health Fund, Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund, Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund..(Sturm, Ira)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ira A Sturm to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the first page of the PDF must clearly indicate what type of pleading is being filed (Complaint, Petition, etc.). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the corrected PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** Initial Pleading due by 8/24/2020. (pne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix).(Sturm, Ira)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -COMPLAINT against R & R Janitorial Inc., R & R Janitorial, Painting & Building Services, Inc., R & R Painting & Building Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21183541)Document filed by Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund, Building Service 32BJ Health Fund, Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund, Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund..(Sturm, Ira) Modified on 8/18/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Building Service 32BJ Health Fund et al v. R & R Janitorial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Service 32BJ Health Fund
Represented By: Ira A Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Service 32BJ Legal Services Fund
Represented By: Ira A Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Service 32BJ Thomas Shortman Training, Scholarship & Safety Fund
Represented By: Ira A Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Service 32BJ Supplemental Savings and Retirement Fund
Represented By: Ira A Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & R Janitorial Inc.
Represented By: Howard Mark Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & R Janitorial, Painting & Building Services, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Mark Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & R Painting & Building Services, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Mark Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?