Sanchez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: JOSE SANCHEZ
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv06535
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332mm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on November 12, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify Defendant of this Notice. SO ORDERED.( Initial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/3/20) (yv)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(dnh)
August 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney James K. Greenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Sanchez..(Greenberg, James)
August 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney James K. Greenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Greenberg, James)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jose Sanchez..(Greenberg, James) Modified on 8/19/2020 (jgo).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Jose Sanchez. Document filed by Jose Sanchez..(Greenberg, James) Modified on 8/21/2020 (dnh).
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney James K. Greenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James K. Greenberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jose Sanchez, United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney James K. Greenberg to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the summons request should not be filed as an attachment to another document. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney James K. Greenberg to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet should not be filed as an attachment to another document; incorrect Basis of Jurisdiction selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James K. Greenberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the County code has been modified to Bronx. (pne)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21185424)Document filed by JOSE SANCHEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS).(Greenberg, James) Modified on 8/18/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE SANCHEZ
Represented By: James K. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?