Acme Ltd. v. Elie Saab NY LLC
Plaintiff: Acme Ltd.
Defendant: Elie Saab NY LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv06542
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Elie Saab NY LLC. Document filed by Acme Ltd.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Last, Bennett)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by August 26, 2020 as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/19/2020) (rro)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elie Saab NY LLC..(pne)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ELIE SAAB NY LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Acme Ltd...(Last, Bennett)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Acme Ltd...(Last, Bennett)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Last, Bennett)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bennett Haskell Last. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $381,877,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Bennett Haskell Last. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elie Saab NY LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21188119)Document filed by Acme Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Last, Bennett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acme Ltd. v. Elie Saab NY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acme Ltd.
Represented By: Bennett Haskell Last
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elie Saab NY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?