Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC et al v. Intrepid U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC and Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC
Defendant: Intrepid U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06552
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 22 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 7, 2020., #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Filed under seal. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #19 .(Berger, David)
October 7, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 7, 2020., #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Redacted. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Lauren J. Pincus in Support re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Berger, David)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 7, 2020. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Sean H. McMahon in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bankruptcy Hearing Transcript dated August 4, 2020, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Zohar Adversary Proceeding Complaint [FILED UNDER SEAL]).(McMahon, Sean)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc., Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Zohar Adversary Proceeding Complaint)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Clark, Christopher)
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated September 30, 2020. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Clark, Christopher)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Henry McMahon on behalf of Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(McMahon, Sean)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
August 31, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 31, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 31, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05528-ALC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated August 27, 2020 re: #7 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated August 24, 2020. . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Jill Pincus on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Pincus, Lauren)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Adam Berger on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Henry Hotz, Jr on behalf of Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Hotz, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Lloyd McQuaid on behalf of Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(McQuaid, Nicholas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated August 24, 2020. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Clark, Christopher)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal (with Exhibits), Statement of Relatedness, Civil Cover Sheet, Docket Sheet, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, and Local Rules for the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York served on Plaintiffs Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC and Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC on August 17, 2020. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Clark, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Clark, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 18, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. as possibly related to 1:20-cv-05540-UA (Currently Unassigned pending Judge Carter's acceptance of related case 1:20-cv-05528-ALC). (dnh)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher J. Clark. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code omitted; Dollar Demand 3,414,221,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:157; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3,414,000. (dnh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-05540. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Christopher) Modified on 8/18/2020 (dnh).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652919/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21191048).Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit 2- Bankruptcy Court Order, #3 Exhibit 3- Transcript dated August 4, 2020).(Clark, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC et al v. Intrepid U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrepid U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Clark
Represented By: Sean Henry McMahon
Represented By: Robert Henry Hotz, Jr
Represented By: Nicholas Lloyd McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Clark
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: David Adam Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Clark
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: David Adam Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?