Belya et al v. Kapral et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Belya
Defendant: Alexandre Antchoutine, Boris Dmitrieff, Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, Serge Lukianov, The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, Serafim Gan, Victor Potapov, David Straut, Pavel Loukianoff, Nicholas Olkhovskiy, Hilarion Kapral, George Temidis, John Does 1 through 100, Mark Mancuso and Metropolitan Hilarion
Case Number: 1:2020cv06597
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that Defendants HILARION KAPRAL a/k/a METROPOLITAN HILARION, NICHOLAS OLKHOVSKIY, VICTOR POTAPOV, SERGE LIKIANOV, DAVID STRAUT, ALEXANDRE ANTCHOUTINE, MARK MANCUSO, GEORGE TEMIDIS, SERAFIM GAN, BORIS DMITRIEFF, EATERN AMERICAN DIOCESE OF THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OUTSIDE OF RUSSIA, and THE SYNOD OF BISHOPS OF THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OUTSIDE OF RUSSIA (collectively, "Defendants") may have additional time within which to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint through November 24, 2020. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., Alexandre Antchoutine answer due 11/24/2020; Boris Dmitrieff answer due 11/24/2020; Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia answer due 11/24/2020; Serafim Gan answer due 11/24/2020; Hilarion Kapral answer due 11/24/2020; Pavel Loukianoff answer due 11/24/2020; Serge Lukianov answer due 11/24/2020; Mark Mancuso answer due 11/24/2020; Nicholas Olkhovskiy answer due 11/24/2020; Victor Potapov answer due 11/24/2020; David Straut answer due 11/24/2020; George Temidis answer due 11/24/2020; The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia answer due 11/24/2020., Motions terminated: #35 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer through November 24, 2020 addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Alak Shah, Esq. dated October 14, 2020. filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, Serge Lukianov, Nicholas Olkhovskiy, Boris Dmitrieff, George Temidis, Hilarion Kapral, Mark Mancuso, John Does 1 through 100, David Straut, Victor Potapov, Alexandre Antchoutine, Serafim Gan, Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/15/2020) (ama)
October 14, 2020 Filing 35 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer through November 24, 2020 addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Alak Shah, Esq. dated October 14, 2020. Document filed by Alexandre Antchoutine, Boris Dmitrieff, Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, Serafim Gan, John Does 1 through 100, Hilarion Kapral, Serge Lukianov, Mark Mancuso, Nicholas Olkhovskiy, Victor Potapov, David Straut, George Temidis, The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulation).(Shah, Alak)
October 13, 2020 Filing 34 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Alexandre Antchoutine served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Boris Dmitrieff served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Serafim Gan served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Hilarion Kapral served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Serge Lukianov served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Mark Mancuso served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Nicholas Olkhovskiy served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Victor Potapov served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; David Straut served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; George Temidis served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
October 8, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alak Shah on behalf of Alexandre Antchoutine, Boris Dmitrieff, Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, Serafim Gan, John Does 1 through 100, Hilarion Kapral, Serge Lukianov, Mark Mancuso, Nicholas Olkhovskiy, Victor Potapov, David Straut, George Temidis, The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia..(Shah, Alak)
October 8, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald J. Feerick, Jr on behalf of Alexandre Antchoutine, Boris Dmitrieff, Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, Serafim Gan, John Does 1 through 100, Hilarion Kapral, Serge Lukianov, Mark Mancuso, Nicholas Olkhovskiy, Victor Potapov, David Straut, George Temidis, The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia..(Feerick, Donald)
September 17, 2020 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Mancuso..(pne)
September 16, 2020 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Mancuso, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 16, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Mark Mancuso added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Alexander Belya. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Oleg Rivkin to RE-FILE Document No. #29 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Unable to issue this summons until this party is added to the docket. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 29 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Mancuso, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg) Modified on 9/16/2020 (dnh).
September 8, 2020 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Serge Lukianov. (sj)
September 6, 2020 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Serge Lukianov, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pavel Loukianoff. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hilarion Kapral. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Serafim Gan. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexandre Antchoutine. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Victor Potapov. (sj)
September 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Oleg Rivkin to RE-FILE Document No. #15 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): This defendant is not a party to this case. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
September 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Oleg Rivkin to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Unable to issue this summons until this party is added to the docket. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
September 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Oleg Rivkin re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Mark Mancuso needs to be added. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boris Dmitrieff. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Temidis. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Straut. (sj)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nicholas Olkhovskiy. (sj)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicholas Lukianov, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Belya.(Rivkin, Oleg) Modified on 9/4/2020 (sj).
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Boris Dmitrieff, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Temidis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Synod Of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Straut, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicholas Olkhovskiy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pavel Loukianoff, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hilarion Kapral, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Serafim Gan, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexandre Antchoutine, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Victor Potapov, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Mancuso, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)
August 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Oleg Rivkin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
August 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Oleg Rivkin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alexandre Antchoutine, Hilarion Kapral. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rivkin, Oleg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexandre Antchoutine, Boris Dmitrieff, Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, Serafim Gan, Hilarion Kapral, Pavel Loukianoff, Serge Lukianov, Nicholas Olkhovskiy, Victor Potapov, David Straut, George Temidis, The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21210728)Document filed by Alexander Belya..(Rivkin, Oleg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belya et al v. Kapral et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandre Antchoutine
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Dmitrieff
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern American Diocese of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serge Lukianov
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serafim Gan
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Potapov
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Straut
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavel Loukianoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Olkhovskiy
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilarion Kapral
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Temidis
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 100
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Mancuso
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Hilarion
Represented By: Donald J. Feerick, Jr
Represented By: Alak Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Belya
Represented By: Oleg Rivkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?