Flanders v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Flanders
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc., Altria Group Distribution Company and Altria Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06607
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332lp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:20-cv-06245, filed on 09/03/2020. (sjo)
September 3, 2020 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/2/2020) (sjo)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application granted. (Altria Group Distribution Company answer due 9/30/2020; Altria Group, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020; Juul Labs, Inc. answer due 10/8/2020.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/26/2020) (jwh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Keri Arnold dated August 25, 2020. Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc...(Arnold, Keri)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Jason Flanders.(Jaroslawicz, David)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Jaroslawicz on behalf of Jason Flanders..(Jaroslawicz, David)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of County of New York. Case Number: 155563-2020..Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Service by Mail of Summons and Complaint and Notice Regarding Electronic Filing - As to Altria Group, Inc., #4 Exhibit D - Statement of Service by Mail of Summons and Complaint and Notice Regarding Electronic Filing - as to Altria Group Distribution Company, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Docket.).(Arnold, Keri)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of CIVIL COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS FOR DEFENDANTS ALTRIA GROUP, INC. AND ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY served on Plaintiff Jason Flanders, and Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. on 8/19/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc...(Arnold, Keri)
August 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Keri L Arnold to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Altria Group Distribution Company. Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company..(Arnold, Keri)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Altria Group, Inc...(Arnold, Keri)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Written Consent to Removal on Behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Juul Labs, Inc...(Horowitz, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Arnold, Keri)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155563-2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21211035).Document filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Arnold, Keri) Modified on 8/19/2020 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flanders v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Keri L Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Represented By: Keri L Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Represented By: Keri L Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Flanders
Represented By: David Jaroslawicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?