Melendez v. Sirius XM Radio Inc.
Plaintiff: John Edward Melendez
Defendant: Sirius XM Radio Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06620
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brent Matthew Reitter on behalf of John Edward Melendez..(Reitter, Brent)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT It is hereby stipulated and agreed to by and between counsel for Plaintiff John Edward Melendez ("Plaintiff") and Defendant Sirius XM Radio Inc. ("Sirius XM") that the time within which Sirius XM may serve and file its response to the Complaint (D.I.1) is hereby extend to October 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/11/2020) Sirius XM Radio Inc. answer due 10/23/2020. (ks) Modified on 9/11/2020 (ks).
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sirius XM Radio Inc...(Baghdassarian, Mark)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sirius XM Radio Inc...(Baghdassarian, Mark)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Hannah Hedvat on behalf of Sirius XM Radio Inc...(Hedvat, Shannon)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Anthony Baghdassarian on behalf of Sirius XM Radio Inc...(Baghdassarian, Mark)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. All Defendants. Service was accepted by Alexander Privat. Document filed by John Edward Melendez..(Popok, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sirius XM Radio Inc.. (sj)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sirius XM Radio Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Edward Melendez..(Popok, Michael)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Steven Popok to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o' or 'via';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Steven Popok. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sirius XM Radio Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Popok, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hamutal Lieberman on behalf of John Edward Melendez..(Lieberman, Hamutal)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sirius XM Radio Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Edward Melendez..(Popok, Michael) Modified on 8/20/2020 (jgo).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Popok, Michael) Modified on 8/20/2020 (jgo).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sirius XM Radio Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21222231)Document filed by John Edward Melendez..(Popok, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melendez v. Sirius XM Radio Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirius XM Radio Inc.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Baghdassarian
Represented By: Shannon Hannah Hedvat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Edward Melendez
Represented By: Hamutal Lieberman
Represented By: Michael Steven Popok
Represented By: Brent Matthew Reitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?