Zillow, Inc. v. Capital One Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Zillow, Inc.
Defendant: Capital One Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06624
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from D. Cameron Moxley dated October 16, 2020 re: telephone conference scheduled for October 20, 2020. Document filed by Zillow, Inc...(Moxley, Danny)
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint and each of the causes of action alleged therein for failure to state a claim for relief. . Document filed by Capital One Bank, N.A...(Matheson, Cameron)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion for Thomas J. Regan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/5/2020) (mml)
October 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Thomas J. Regan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21959318. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Thomas J. Regan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21959318. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Regan, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Thomas J. Regan, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Regan, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/1/2020) (jca)
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint and each of the causes of action alleged therein for failure to state a claim for relief. / Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Zillow, Inc...(Molton, David)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from David J. Molton dated September 23, 2020 re: request for oral argument. Document filed by Zillow, Inc...(Molton, David)
September 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 10/6/2020. (rjm)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from David J. Molton dated September 1, 2020. Document filed by Zillow, Inc. Ok. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/2/2020) (rjm)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from David J. Molton dated September 1, 2020. Document filed by Zillow, Inc...(Molton, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danny Cameron Moxley on behalf of Zillow, Inc...(Moxley, Danny)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Molton on behalf of Zillow, Inc...(Molton, David)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Declaration of Cameron Matheson in Support of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion served on David J. Molton, Esq. on August 27, 2020. Service was made by Federal Express Overnight. Document filed by Capital One Bank, N.A...(Snyder, Theodore)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint and each of the causes of action alleged therein for failure to state a claim for relief. . Document filed by Capital One Bank, N.A...(Murphy, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Cameron Matheson in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint and each of the causes of action alleged therein for failure to state a claim for relief.. Document filed by Capital One Bank, N.A...(Murphy, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint and each of the causes of action alleged therein for failure to state a claim for relief. Document filed by Capital One Bank, N.A...(Murphy, James)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Theodore R. Snyder dated August 21, 2020 re: To comply with Section IV(A) and (B) of the Courts Individual Practices, as subject matter jurisdiction in this case is founded on diversity of jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. A courtesy copy of plaintiffs Complaint, which was the only pleading filed or served while the case remained in the Supreme Court of New York, New York County.. Document filed by Capital One Bank, N.A...(Snyder, Theodore)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank, N.A.. Document filed by Capital One Bank, N.A...(Snyder, Theodore)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cameron S. Matheson on behalf of Capital One Bank, N.A...(Matheson, Cameron)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore R. Snyder on behalf of Capital One Bank, N.A...(Snyder, Theodore)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on David J. Molton, Esq. on August 19, 2020. Service was made by Federal Express Overnight. Document filed by Capital One Bank, N.A...(Murphy, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Murphy, James)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653262/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21224679).Document filed by Capital One Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint in State Court Action).(Murphy, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zillow, Inc. v. Capital One Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, N.A.
Represented By: James Alwin Murphy
Represented By: Cameron S. Matheson
Represented By: Theodore R. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zillow, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Regan
Represented By: Danny Cameron Moxley
Represented By: David J. Molton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?