Open Society Justice Initiative v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Plaintiff: Open Society Justice Initiative
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Case Number: 1:2020cv06625
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to three weeks after the date of the Court's decision on the forthcoming cross-motions for summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/17/2020) (jwh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, until after motions are resolved, if necessary addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 9/16/2020. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court adopts the schedule proposed by the Government, under which ODNI would respond to plaintiffs' request by October 9. The Court adopts the following schedule for summary judgment briefing: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due November 9, 2020; Plaintiff will file its motion for summary judgment and its opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment by December 9, 2020; Defendant will file its reply in support of its summary judgment motion, and its opposition to plaintiff's summary judgment motion, by December 23, 2020. Plaintiff will file its reply in support of its summary judgment motion by January 6, 2021. Motions due by 12/9/2020. Responses due by 12/23/2020 Replies due by 1/21/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/9/2020) (nb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu and Catherine Amirfar dated 9/3/2020 re: the parties' views on consolidation, the response to the FOIA request, and scheduling. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Teleanu, Natasha)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Teleanu, Natasha)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative..(Singh, Amrit)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahern for personal service. Registered Mailings were also completed on 8/20/20.. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Max Aronoff on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court has received the Complaint in this matter and has determined that it is related to the FOIA litigation pending before the Court in Open Society Justice Initiative v. Central Intelligence Agency, et al., No. 19 Civ. 234 (PAE) (BCM). To assure the efficient and coordinated litigation of these matters, the Court directs counsel to promptly meet and confer, and to submit a joint letter by September 3, 2020, setting out the parties' views as to a plan for the prompt adjudication of the claims in the newly filed case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/21/2020) (cf)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 20, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(pne)
August 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 19CV234. (pne)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Open Society Institute for Open Society Justice Initiative. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-234-PAE. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Amirfar, Catherine)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21227730)Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2/27/20 Schiff letter to Director Grenell, #2 Exhibit B - 7/20/20 FOIA Request, #3 Exhibit C - 7/22/20 FOIA Request Acknowledgment).(Amirfar, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Open Society Justice Initiative v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Peter Max Aronoff
Represented By: Natasha Waglow Teleanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Society Justice Initiative
Represented By: Catherine M. Amirfar
Represented By: Amrit Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?