Baptiste v. ABM
Plaintiff: Edler Jean Baptiste
Defendant: ABM Aviation, Inc. and ABM
Case Number: 1:2020cv06626
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446lb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Received returned mail re: #4 Order to Show Cause. Mail was addressed to Edler Jean Baptiste, 126-15 Foch Boulevard, #200635, South Ozone Park, NY 11420 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender Attempted - Not Known Unable to Forward. (vn)
September 21, 2020 Received returned mail re: #8 Order, #7 Order. Mail was addressed to Edler Jean Baptiste, 126-15 Foch Boulevard, #200635, South Ozone Park, NY 11420 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return To Sender Attempted - Not Known Unable To Forward. (vn)
August 27, 2020 Mailed a copy of #8 Order, #7 Order to Edler Jean Baptiste at 126-15 Foch Boulevard, #200635, South Ozone Park, NY 11420, by Certified Mail # 7019 1120 0000 8895 2854 with Return Receipt Requested. (kh)
August 27, 2020 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 37 1004 950 0 on 8/27/2020. (nb)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On August 26, 2020, the Court, finding that Defendant had not established subject-matter jurisdiction for removal to federal court, issued an order directing the Clerk of Court to remand this case to New York State Supreme Court, County of New York. Dkt. No. 7. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order and Dkt. No. 7 to Plaintiff by certified mail. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/26/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: For the reasons stated above, Defendant has not established subject- matter jurisdiction exists here and therefore, this case is remanded. The Clerk of Court is directed to remand this case to New York State Supreme Court, County of New York without delay. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/26/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certification in Response to Order to Show Cause served on Edler Jean Baptiste on August 25, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by ABM..(Weinberg, Harry)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #4 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by ABM..(Weinberg, Harry)
August 21, 2020 Mailed a copy of #4 Order to Show Cause to Edler Jean Baptiste at 126-15 Foch Boulevard, #200635, South Ozone Park, NY 11420, by Certified Mail # 7019 1120 0000 8895 2816 with Return Receipt Requested. (kh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Defendant is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by August 25, 2020 as to why this action should not be remanded to New York Supreme Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff by certified mail. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/21/2020) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Harry Mark Weinberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ABM, Edler Jean Baptiste. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Harry Mark Weinberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 320 (Assault Libel & Slander); Dollar Demand $76,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 360 (P.I.: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet. (pne)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weinberg, Harry)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Harry Mark Weinberg. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ABM Industries, Inc. for ABM Aviation, Inc.. Document filed by ABM Aviation, Inc...(Weinberg, Harry)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 100566/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21225450).Document filed by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint).(Weinberg, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baptiste v. ABM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Mark Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM
Represented By: Harry Mark Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edler Jean Baptiste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?