Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund and Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., AbbVie Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Applicant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Case Number: 1:2020cv06647
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22154154. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
October 15, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22154154. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Seaver, Todd)
October 13, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL. (va)
October 13, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (va)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION & ORDER re: (35 in 1:20-cv-05826-LJL) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and Request for Guidance re: End-Payor Plaintiffs' Leadership Applications addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Sharon Robertson dated September 3, 2 filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby: ORDERED that the motion to appoint Sharon K. Robertson of Cohen Milstein and Robin van der Muelen of Labaton Sucharow as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the putative class is GRANTED. Cohen Milstein and Labaton Sucharow will be responsible for the overall conduct of the litigation on behalf of the putative class of End-Payor Plaintiffs, including providing supervision of all class Plaintiffs' counsel in this litigation. As Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, Cohen Milstein and Labaton Sucharow have the authority to: (As further set forth herein this Order.) It is further ORDERED that the motions by other counsel for appointment as interim class counsel for the putative End-Payor class are DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the motion to appoint interim class counsel for the putative Direct Purchaser class is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel may not delegate responsibility or assign legal work to other law firms without the prior approval of the Court. No firm to which to which Interim Co-Lead Counsel delegates responsibility, when delegating with the approval of the Court, may further sub-delegate the work without the prior approval of interim co-lead counsel and the Court. It is further ORDERED that an Initial Pretrial Conference will be held on October 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. by TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. At that date and time, the parties are directed to dial the Court's conference line at 888-251-2909 (access code: 2123101). It is further ORDERED that, by October 22, 2020 at 5:00 p.m., interim class counsel for the End-Payor Actions and Defendants thereto, and counsel for the named plaintiff in the Direct Purchaser Actions and Defendants thereto, shall jointly file a single Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order which shall be filed in each of the Direct Purchaser Actions and in the consolidated End-Payor Action, No. 20-cv-5538, and shaLL include the following: (1) a uniform and identical date by which will be filed any amended complaint in the Direct Purchaser Actions and the consolidated amended complaint in the End-Payor Actions; (2) a uniform and identical date by which responsive papers will be due in both the Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Actions; (3) a uniform and identical briefing schedule for any motions to dismiss filed in either the Direct Purchaser or End-Payor Actions; (4) a uniform and identical schedule for discovery and post-discovery conferences and motions that will govern the Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Actions. All deadlines for filing responsive papers are adjourned pending further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that by October 22, 2020 at 5:00 p.m., counsel in the Direct Purchaser Actions shall file a letter with the Court stating whether the two Direct Purchaser Actions should be consolidated. It is further ORDERED that the End-Payor Actions be consolidated; the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate the following cases under No. 20-cv-5538: No. 20-cv-7580; No. 20-cv-7352; No. 20-cv-5837; No. 20-cv-5813; No. 20-cv-7492; No. 20-cv-5826; No. 20-cv-7309; No. 20-cv-5901; No. 20-cv-6769; No. 20-cv-7177; No. 20-cv-6647; No. 20-cv-7296; No. 20-cv-7304. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/13/2020) (va)
September 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Colleen Cleary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21833372. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 24, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Colleen Cleary to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21833372. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Cleary, Colleen)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from J. Mark Gidley dated September 15, 2020. Document filed by AbbVie Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC. Document filed by AbbVie Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Mark Gidley on behalf of AbbVie Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Allergan, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mayor and City Council of Baltimore dated Sept. 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment of Cohen Milstein as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Proposed End-Payor Class. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Robertson, Sharon)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Dena C. Sharp dated September 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume).(Sharp, Christina)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Patrick T. Egan dated September 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel for End Payor Plaintiffs (corrected). Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (SEE #15) LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Todd A. Seaver dated September 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel for End Payor Plaintiffs. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick) Modified on 9/10/2020 (kj).
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Forest Laboratories, LLC served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Forest Laboratories, Inc. served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Allergan USA, Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Allergan Sales, LLC served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. AbbVie Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by Emily Schroeder, Registered Agent. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
September 8, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
September 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Patrick T. Egan dated September 3, 2020 re: EPPs Request to Postpone Filing a Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and for Guidance on Leadership Applications. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Patrick T. Egan dated August 24, 2020 re: Objecting to Consolidation. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AbbVie Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(dnh)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
August 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Patrick Thomas Egan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-05538 (LJL). Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AbbVie, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., and Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Egan, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AbbVie Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21233653)Document filed by Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan..(Egan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Western Region & Local 177 Health Care Plan
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Egan
Represented By: Colleen Cleary
Represented By: Todd Seaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Applicant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?