Duka v. Alliance Tri-State Construction, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rilind Duka
Defendant: Merima Mesik Duka, Alliance Tri-State Construction, Inc, Alliance Tri-State Maintenance Corp. and Argjent Duka
Case Number: 1:2020cv06648
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William Michael Brown on behalf of Rilind Duka. New Address: Brown Kwon & Lam, LLP, 521 5th Avenue, Suite 1744, New York, New York, United States 10175, 7189710326..(Brown, William)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties in the above-captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that Defendants shall have until November 16, 2020 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants waive all defenses of improper service of process, and accept service of the Complaint and all amendments thereon. Alliance Tri-State Construction, Inc answer due 11/16/2020; Alliance Tri-State Maintenance Corp. answer due 11/16/2020; Argjent Duka answer due 11/16/2020; Merima Mesik Duka answer due 11/16/2020. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/1/2020) (mro)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Rilind Duka..(Brown, William)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merima Mesik Duka..(dnh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Argjent Duka..(dnh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alliance Tri-State Maintenance Corp...(dnh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alliance Tri-State Construction, Inc..(dnh)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Michael Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Richmond. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Michael Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rilind Duka. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merima Mesik Duka, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rilind Duka..(Brown, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Argjent Duka, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rilind Duka..(Brown, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alliance Tri-State Maintenance Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rilind Duka..(Brown, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alliance Tri-State Construction, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rilind Duka..(Brown, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alliance Tri-State Construction, Inc, Alliance Tri-State Maintenance Corp., Argjent Duka, Merima Mesik Duka. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21234977)Document filed by Rilind Duka..(Brown, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duka v. Alliance Tri-State Construction, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merima Mesik Duka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Tri-State Construction, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Tri-State Maintenance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argjent Duka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rilind Duka
Represented By: William Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?