Sgromo v. Peacock Alley Entertainment et al
Plaintiff: Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo
Defendant: James Buddy Day, Pyramid Productions, NBC Universal Media LLC and Peacock Alley Entertainment
Case Number: 1:2020cv06658
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), is dismissed for failure to state a claim, see 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(2), with 30 days' leave to replead. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion for permission for electronic case filing (ECF No. 3) for failure to complete an introductory course in this District. Plaintiff's request for the issuance of summonses (ECF Nos. 8-10) is denied as moot. Plaintiff has consented to electronic service. (ECF No. 4.) Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Permission for Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo (a/k/a Peter Anthony Sgromo) to participate in electronic case filing in this case filed by James Buddy Day. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/9/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 31, 2020 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pyramid Productions Inc. James "Buddy" Day[alter ego], re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo.(sc)
August 31, 2020 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NBC Universal Legal Dept., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo. (sc)
August 31, 2020 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peacock Alley Entertainment, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo. (sc)
August 31, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/28/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 25, 2020 Mailed a copy of #6 Subpoena Issued to Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo at 3-113 Marks St. S Thunder Bay, ON P7E 1L8 Canada. (bwa)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUBPOENA ISSUED.Document filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo.(bwa)
August 24, 2020 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted, re: #5 Request for Subpoena - Received, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Subpoena Received: Request subpoena(s) from Pietro Pasquale A. Sgromo received on 8/24/20. (sc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo (a/k/a Peter Anthony Sgromo) consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo..(ks)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FORELECTRONIC CASE FILING for Permission for Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo (a/k/a Peter Anthony Sgromo) to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by James Buddy Day..(ks)
August 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (ks)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against James "Buddy" Day, NBC Universal Media LLC, Peacock Alley Entertainment, Pyramid Productions. Document filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo..(ks) Modified on 8/21/2020 (ks).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo..(ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sgromo v. Peacock Alley Entertainment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Buddy Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyramid Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peacock Alley Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?