Wentworth Group, Inc. et al v. Evanston Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Firstservice Residential New York, Inc., FS Project Management, LLC and Wentworth Group, Inc.
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv06711
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION OF STEFAN BOGDANOVICH, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion for Stefan Bogdanovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/8/2020) (cf) Modified on 10/9/2020 (cf).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Stefan Bogdanovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED (Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21763200). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Stefan Bogdanovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED (Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21763200). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FS Project Management, LLC, Firstservice Residential New York, Inc., Wentworth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Bogdanovich, Stefan)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #5 Complaint. Document filed by Evanston Insurance Company..(Tricarico, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #17 MOTION for Stefan Bogdanovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21763200. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Stefan Bogdanovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21763200. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FS Project Management, LLC, Firstservice Residential New York, Inc., Wentworth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stefan Bogdanovich, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Admission).(Bogdanovich, Stefan) Modified on 9/22/2020 (vba).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Wentworth Group Inc. for FS Project Management, LLC, Firstservice Residential New York, Inc.. Document filed by FS Project Management, LLC, Firstservice Residential New York, Inc., Wentworth Group, Inc...(Leber, Bernice)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Bernice K. Leber to RE-FILE Document #10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter, filed by Evanston Insurance Company. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Evanston Insurance Company answer due 9/29/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/9/2020) (mml)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Michael J. Tricarico dated September 8, 2020 re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Waiver of Service).(Tricarico, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Craig Kaufman, Jr on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company..(Kaufman, Thomas)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Bernice K. Leber dated 08/25/2020 re: Initial Pre-trial Conference Order sent to Defendant's Counsel. Document filed by FS Project Management, LLC, Firstservice Residential New York, Inc., Wentworth Group, Inc...(Leber, Bernice)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Evanston Insurance Company served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Wentworth Group, Inc.; Firstservice Residential New York, Inc.; FS Project Management, LLC..(Leber, Bernice)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FS Project Management, LLC, Firstservice Residential New York, Inc., Wentworth Group, Inc...(Leber, Bernice) Modified on 9/10/2020 (ldi).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company. Document filed by Evanston Insurance Company..(Tricarico, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Tricarico on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company..(Tricarico, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/25/2020) (jwh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leber, Bernice)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Evanston Insurance Company. Document filed by Wentworth Group, Inc., Firstservice Residential New York, Inc., FS Project Management, LLC..(Leber, Bernice)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Evanston Insurance Company..(dnh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bernice K. Leber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $4,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $4,000,000. (dnh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Bernice K. Leber to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Bernice K. Leber to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Evanston Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by FS Project Management, LLC, Firstservice Residential New York, Inc., Wentworth Group, Inc...(Leber, Bernice)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leber, Bernice) Modified on 8/21/2020 (dnh).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Evanston Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21254454)Document filed by Wentworth Group, Inc., Firstservice Residential New York, Inc., FS Project Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Evanston Ins. Co. Policy, #2 Exhibit B. NYS Supreme Court Complaint filed by Board of Managers of 325 Fifth Ave. vs. Continental Residential Holdings LLC et al Index No. 154764/2012, #3 Exhibit C. Answer with Cross-Claim By Basonas in the state court action, #4 Exhibit D. August 3, 2015 Letter from Chad Zupke, Sr. Claims Examiner of Evanston to Wentworth, #5 Exhibit E. Stipulation dated August 17, 2017 among parties in the state court action, #6 Exhibit F. May 30, 2019 email confirmation of coverage from Chad Zupke, Sr. Claims Examiner of Evanston to Wentworth w/Aug. 3, 2015 letter attached, #7 Exhibit G. June 10, 2020 denial of coverage letter from Michael Tricarico of Kennedys, Evanstons outside counsel to Wentworth, #8 Exhibit H. NYS Supreme Court Justice Kelly ONeill Levy State Court Decision and Order dated July 16, 2020 in the state court action).(Leber, Bernice) Modified on 8/21/2020 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wentworth Group, Inc. et al v. Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Craig Kaufman, Jr
Represented By: Michael J. Tricarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firstservice Residential New York, Inc.
Represented By: Bernice K. Leber
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS Project Management, LLC
Represented By: Bernice K. Leber
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wentworth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Bernice K. Leber
Represented By: Stefan Bogdanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?