Ray v. Ray et al
Plaintiff: Ames Ray
Defendant: Christina Ray and John Doe Guarnerius Entities #1-20
Case Number: 1:2020cv06720
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Granted. Plaintiff's oppositions to Dkts. 5 and 14 are due November 11, 2020, and defendant's replies, if any, are due December 2, 2020. The Court will then decide whether to hold oral argument on these motions. October 14, 2020 SO ORDERED. Responses due by 11/11/2020 Replies due by 12/2/2020. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/14/2020) (kv)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 FIRST MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11., #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). on consent addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Rita W. Gordon dated October 14, 2020. Document filed by Ames Ray..(Gordon, Rita)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: On October 12, 2020, defendant Christina Ray filed a motion for sanctions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. Dkt. 14. It is hereby ordered that plaintiff Ames Ray shall serve any opposition to the motion for sanctions by October 26, 2020. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be served by November 2, 2020. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply the Court with courtesy copies of all motion papers via email to EngelmayerNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/13/2020) (cf)
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew A. Beyer dated October 12, 2020 re: Oral Argument Request for Motion for Sanctions. Document filed by Christina Ray..(Beyer, Matthew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Matthew A. Beyer in Support re: #14 FIRST MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11.. Document filed by Christina Ray. (Attachments: #1 Ex A: MTD Dec (1 of 4), #2 Ex A: MTD Dec (2 of 4), #3 Ex A: MTD Dec (3 of 4), #4 Ex A: MTD Dec (4 of 4), #5 Ex B: Watnick Decision, #6 Ex C: Watnick Appeal, #7 Ex D: 8 15 13 Email, #8 Ex E: 7 17 13 Email, #9 Ex F: 11 11 15 Email, #10 Ex G: 1 6 16 Email, #11 Ex H 6 12 14 Email, #12 Ex I: IRS Action Decision, #13 Ex J: 10 7 20 Letter, #14 Ex K: Petition Decision).(Beyer, Matthew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 FIRST MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11. . Document filed by Christina Ray..(Beyer, Matthew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11. Document filed by Christina Ray..(Beyer, Matthew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions served on Ames Ray on 8/26/2020. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by Christina Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: 8/26 Service, #2 Exhibit Ex B: 9/16 Service).(Beyer, Matthew)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew A. Beyer dated October 7, 2020 re: Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Christina Ray..(Beyer, Matthew)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe Guarnerius Entities #1-20, Christina Ray with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Ames Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - 1993 trading agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Aug. 10, 1994 correspondence, #3 Exhibit Ex C - UCC Financing statement, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Net worth statement (redacted), #5 Exhibit Ex E - 2009 email, #6 Exhibit Ex F - Aff of service, #7 Exhibit Ex G - March 14, 2011 affidavit, #8 Exhibit Ex H - 1991 promissory note, #9 Exhibit Ex I - Sept. 5, 1993 agreement, #10 Exhibit Ex J - Feb. 15, 2011 affidavit).(Gordon, Rita)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss served on Ames Ray on 8/27/2020. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by Christina Ray..(Beyer, Matthew)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by September 16, 2020. No further opportunities to amend will ordinarily be granted. If plaintiff does amend, by October 7, 2020, defendants shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) submit a letter to the Court, copying plaintiff, stating that they rely on the previously filed motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by September 16, 2020. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served by September 30, 2020. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply the Court with courtesy copies of all motion papers via email to EngelmayerNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. Defendants are further ORDERED to serve the motion to dismiss and related papers, see Dkts. 5-8, on plaintiff forthwith and file proof of this service no later than Friday, August 28, 2020. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2020. Motions due by 10/7/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/26/2020) (jwh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew A. Beyer dated 8/26/2020 re: Oral Argument Request for Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Christina Ray..(Beyer, Matthew)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Christina Ray..(Beyer, Matthew)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Matthew A. Beyer in Support re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Christina Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1: 2020 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 2: 2010 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex 3: 2010 Decision, #4 Exhibit Ex 4: 2020 Affirmation, #5 Exhibit Ex 5: 2014 Complaint, #6 Exhibit Ex 6: 2014 Decision, #7 Exhibit Ex 7: 2014 Affirmation, #8 Exhibit Ex 8: 2018 Complaint, #9 Exhibit Ex 9: 2018 Decision, #10 Exhibit Ex 10: 2018 Affirmation, #11 Exhibit Ex 11: 2020 Petition, #12 Exhibit Ex 12: Emails with Petition trial court).(Beyer, Matthew)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Christina Ray. Responses due by 9/9/2020.(Beyer, Matthew)
August 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Alan Mark Beyer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1332fr; Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Dollar Demand 420,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332nr; the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Dollar Demand has been modified to omitted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Beyer, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on AMES RAY on 8/21/2020. Document filed by Christina Ray..(Beyer, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-07035. Document filed by Christina Ray..(Beyer, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652984/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21264382).Document filed by Christina Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: State Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex B: Affidavit of Service).(Beyer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Ray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Ray
Represented By: Matthew Alan Mark Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Guarnerius Entities #1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ames Ray
Represented By: Rita W. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?