Martinez Roman v. Decker et al
Petitioner: Marco Martinez Roman
Respondent: Thomas Decker, Chad F. Wolf and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv06752
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #11 Memorandum & Opinion. in favor of Marco Martinez Roman against Chad F. Wolf, Thomas Decker, William Barr. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated September 25, 2019, Mr. Martinez's petition is granted in part; because the Court resolves this Petition on the papers; Mr. Martinez's request for oral argument is denied; Within seven calendar days of the date of this Opinion and Order, Respondents must provide Mr. Martinez with a bond hearing before an IJ at which the Government bears the burden of establishing, by clear and convincing evidence, that he poses a danger to the community or a flight risk. At this hearing, the IJ must consider alternative conditions of release and Mr. Martinez's ability to pay. Should Respondents fail to provide Mr. Martinez with such a bond hearing within seven calendar days, they must immediately release him; accordingly, this case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 09/25/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER. Mr. Martinez's Petition is hereby GRANTED in part. Because the Court resolves this Petition on the papers, Mr. Martinez's request for oral argument is DENIED. Within seven calendar days of the date of this Opinion and Order, Respondents must provide Mr. Martinez with a bond hearing before an IJ at which the Government bears the burden of establishing, by clear and convincing evidence, that he poses a danger to the community or a flight risk. At this hearing, the IJ must consider alternative conditions of release and Mr. Martinez's ability to pay. Should Respondents fail to provide Mr. Martinez with such a bond hearing within seven calendar days, they must immediately release him. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/25/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Petitioner Marco Martinez Roman dated Sept. 22, 2020 re: Departure of Petitioner's Immigration Counsel on Oct. 1, 2020. Document filed by Marco Martinez Roman..(Mathur, Suchita)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY in Support of Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Marco Martinez Roman..(Levine, Zoe)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zoe Pokempner Levine on behalf of Marco Martinez Roman..(Levine, Zoe)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, . Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Decker, Chad F. Wolf..(Waterman, Brandon)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Decker, Chad F. Wolf..(Waterman, Brandon)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 Letter filed by Marco Martinez Roman. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 9/2/2020, Replies due by 9/9/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/28/2020) (rro)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Petitioner dated Aug. 27, 2020 re: Jointly Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Marco Martinez Roman..(Mathur, Suchita)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Marco Martinez Roman. The Court is in receipt of Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed on August 21, 2020. See Dkt. No. 1. The parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule on Petitioner's application by August 31, 2020. If the parties are unable to reach agreement, they shall submit their respective proposals separately by that time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/24/2020) (kv)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mathur, Suchita)
August 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Suchita Deolalikar Mathur. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Thomas Decker; Chad F. Wolf; William Barr. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
August 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Suchita Deolalikar Mathur. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21271212)Document filed by Marco Martinez Roman. (Attachments: #1 A. NTA, #2 B. Bond Evid., #3 C. DHS Bond Evid., #4 D. IJ Bond Decision, #5 E. BIA Bond Decision, #6 F. Psych. Report, #7 G. Dr. Apstein Letters).(Mathur, Suchita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Roman v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco Martinez Roman
Represented By: Suchita Deolalikar Mathur
Represented By: Zoe Pokempner Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?