Kaufman v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael Philip Kaufman and Michael Philip Kaufman
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06879
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Ronald Abramson dated October 23, 2020 re: #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated 10/20/2020. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Ronald Abramson dated October 23, 2020 re: #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File for Motion to Dismiss and Strike addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin Johnson dated 10/20/2020. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated 10/20/2020. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File for Motion to Dismiss and Strike addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin Johnson dated 10/20/2020. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before the Court is adjourned. Counsel for all parties are hereby directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 29, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by October 26, 2020, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/15/2020) (ama)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John Peter Cronan. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
September 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2020, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel for the parties, and subject to the approval and order of the Court, that: 1. Defendant, Salesforce hereby waives the defenses of insufficient process and insufficient service of process, but expressly reserves, and fully retains the right to assert, all other defenses without limitation. 2. Salesforce's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including October 20, 2020. (Salesforce.com, Inc. answer due 10/20/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/18/2020) (jwh)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward John DeFranco on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc...(DeFranco, Edward)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Biddinger, Brian)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin P.B. Johnson on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Paul Biddinger on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc...(Biddinger, Brian)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2020 ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/11/2020) (jwh) Modified on 9/15/2020 (jwh).
September 11, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff, Patent Judge. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
August 31, 2020 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 16cv2880 and declined by Judge Alvin K Hellerstein and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ari Jason Jaffess on behalf of Michael Philip Kaufman..(Jaffess, Ari)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mord Michael Lewis on behalf of Michael Philip Kaufman..(Lewis, Mord)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Guerrero Liston on behalf of Michael Philip Kaufman..(Liston, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Gregg Patchen on behalf of Michael Philip Kaufman..(Patchen, Alex)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Salesforce.com, Inc...(dnh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(dnh)
August 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ronald Abramson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Salesforce.com, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
August 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 26, 2020 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to salesforce.com, inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Ronald Abramson re: that this action be filed as related to 16-cv-2880 (AKH). Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Abramson, Ronald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Abramson, Ronald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21326235)Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX-A US Pat No 7885981, #2 Exhibit EX-B US Pat No 10025801, #3 Exhibit EX-C US Pat Pub 2019/00951173A1, #4 Exhibit EX-D Notice Letters).(Abramson, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufman v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Brian Paul Biddinger
Represented By: Edward John DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael Philip Kaufman
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Philip Kaufman
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Alex Gregg Patchen
Represented By: David Guerrero Liston
Represented By: Mord Michael Lewis
Represented By: Ari Jason Jaffess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?