Curry et al v. P&G Auditors and Consultants, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Mazzitelli, Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim and Kenneth Curry
Defendant: PGX, LLC, P&G AUDITORS AND CONSULTANTS, LLC, APPLE BANCORP, INC. d/b/a APPLE BANK FOR SAVINGS, GRC SOLUTIONS, LLC and Apple Bancorp, Inc. doing business as Apple Bank For Savings
Cross Claimant: Apple Bancorp, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06985
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. PGX, LLC served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim; Ricardo Mazzitelli; Kenneth Curry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of mailing of service).(Klein, Julia)
October 16, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. GRC Solutions, LLC served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim; Ricardo Mazzitelli; Kenneth Curry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of mailing of service).(Klein, Julia)
October 16, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. P&G Auditors and Consultants, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim; Ricardo Mazzitelli; Kenneth Curry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit showing service by mail).(Klein, Julia)
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim..(Klein, Julia)
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Ricardo Mazzitelli..(Klein, Julia)
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kenneth Curry..(Klein, Julia)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,., CROSSCLAIM against GRC Solutions, LLC. Document filed by Apple Bancorp, Inc...(Yuzek, Dean)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Apple Financial Holdings, Inc. for Apple Bancorp, Inc.. Document filed by Apple Bancorp, Inc...(Yuzek, Dean)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/24/2020) (ama)
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant Apple Bancorp, Inc. d/b/a Apple Bank for Savings ("Apple Bank"), that Apple Bank's time to answer or move with respect to the Complaint in this action be extended from September 17, 2020 to and including October 15, 2020; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Apple Bank waives its right to assert any defense in this action that is based upon lack of service and/or insufficiency of service of process. The foregoing stipulation is approved nunc pro tunc. Apple Bancorp, Inc. answer due 10/15/2020. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/24/2020) (mro)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dean G. Yuzek on behalf of Apple Bancorp, Inc...(Yuzek, Dean)
September 16, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED. The document was a duplicate entry. (dnh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to P&G Auditors and Consultants, LLC..(dnh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Beth Grannis on behalf of Apple Bancorp, Inc...(Grannis, Amanda)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Blaire Zourigui on behalf of Apple Bancorp, Inc...(Zourigui, Jennifer)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to P&G Auditors and Consultants, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kenneth Curry, Ricardo Mazzitelli, Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim..(Klein, Julia)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Apple Bancorp, Inc...(Yuzek, Dean)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PGX, LLC..(jgo)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GRC Solutions, LLC..(jgo)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apple Bancorp, Inc...(jgo)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PGX, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kenneth Curry, Ricardo Mazzitelli, Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim..(Klein, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GRC Solutions, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kenneth Curry, Ricardo Mazzitelli, Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim..(Klein, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apple Bancorp, Inc. d/b/a Apple Bank for Savings, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kenneth Curry, Ricardo Mazzitelli, Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim..(Klein, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-02527. Document filed by Kenneth Curry, Ricardo Mazzitelli, Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim..(Klein, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Klein, Julia)
August 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Julia Klein. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
August 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Julia Klein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:020. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201. (dnh)
August 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Julia Klein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: APPLE BANCORP, INC. d/b/a APPLE BANK FOR SAVINGS, GRC SOLUTIONS, LLC, P&G AUDITORS AND CONSULTANTS, LLC, Kenneth Curry, Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim, Ricardo Mazzitelli. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APPLE BANCORP, INC. d/b/a APPLE BANK FOR SAVINGS, GRC SOLUTIONS, LLC, P&G AUDITORS AND CONSULTANTS, LLC, PGX, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21369180)Document filed by Kenneth Curry, Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim, Ricardo Mazzitelli..(Klein, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry et al v. P&G Auditors and Consultants, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PGX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&G AUDITORS AND CONSULTANTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE BANCORP, INC. d/b/a APPLE BANK FOR SAVINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRC SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Bancorp, Inc. doing business as Apple Bank For Savings
Represented By: Jennifer Blaire Zourigui
Represented By: Amanda Beth Grannis
Represented By: Dean G. Yuzek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Mazzitelli
Represented By: Julia Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Brown Pilgrim
Represented By: Julia Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Curry
Represented By: Julia Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Apple Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Blaire Zourigui
Represented By: Amanda Beth Grannis
Represented By: Dean G. Yuzek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?